EP4013982 - SEALING ARRANGEMENT, HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEALING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Strasse 2 72581 Dettingen / DE | For all designated states Elringklinger Kunststofftechnik GmbH Etzelstrasse 10 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBER, Markus Ludwigsburgerstrasse 7 71711 Steinheim / DE | 02 /
KOPP, Fabian Hauptstrasse 85 71732 Tamm / DE | 03 /
MAIER, Martin Enzstrasse 20 74379 Ingersheim / DE | 04 /
HOCKER, Klaus Enzstrasse 22 74379 Ingersheim / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20757322.1 | 14.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020EP72903 | Priority number, date | DE201910212262 | 15.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019212262 | [2022/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028580 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4013982 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/3208, F02M59/00, F04B53/00, F16J15/3212, F16J15/3216, F16J15/322, F16J15/3232, F16J15/3252, F16J15/3276, F16J15/328 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
F16J15/3208 (EP);
F02M59/442 (EP);
F04B1/0448 (EP);
F04B53/02 (EP);
F04B53/143 (EP);
F16J15/3212 (EP);
F16J15/3216 (EP);
F16J15/322 (EP);
F16J15/3232 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG, HOCHDRUCKPUMPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2022/25] | English: | SEALING ARRANGEMENT, HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEALING ARRANGEMENT | [2022/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ, POMPE HAUTE PRESSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ENSEMBLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 10.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2007057472 (HATCH FREDERICK R [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9,15-18 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 36]; figures 1-6 * [A] 4-7,10,13; | [YD]WO2016096516 (ELRINGKLINGER AG [DE]) [YD] 14 * figures 7-8 *; | [Y]DE102016205057 (ELRINGKLINGER AG [DE]) [Y] 11,12,19* paragraphs [0068] , [0 71] *; | [XA]DE102017110115 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,15,16,18 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * [A] 4-7,9,10,13,17; | [XAY]DE102017211353 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,13,15-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 29]; figure 2 * [A] 2-7,9 [Y] 11,12,14,19 | by applicant | DE10116658 | EP1277951 | EP1284358 | EP1394452 | DE102006055298 | WO2014048606 | DE102013000154 | DE102014100577 | WO2016096516 | DE102016202211 |