EP4003431 - PARTICULATE STRUCTURES MADE FROM GOLD NANOPARTICLES, METHODS FOR PREPARING SAME AND USES THEREOF FOR TREATING SOLID TUMOURS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universite De Franche Comte 1 Rue Claude Goudimel 25030 Besançon / FR | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAURENT, Gautier 14B rue d'Emagny 25115 Pouilley-les-Vignes / FR | 02 /
BEDUNEAU, Arnaud 9A rue du 27 Août 25800 Valdahon / FR | 03 /
ROUX, Stéphane 3 chemin de la Messe Les granges du Sapin 25440 Cheneycey / FR | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20757379.1 | 23.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020FR51352 | Priority number, date | FR20190008368 | 23.07.2019 Original published format: FR 1908368 | [2022/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021014103 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003431 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61K49/04, A61K49/18, A61K51/12, B82Y5/00, B82Y15/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
A61K49/1881 (EP,US);
A61K49/0428 (EP,US);
A61K49/0002 (EP);
A61K51/1251 (EP);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | TEILCHENFÖRMIGE STRUKTUREN AUS GOLDNANOPARTIKELN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FESTEN TUMOREN | [2022/22] | English: | PARTICULATE STRUCTURES MADE FROM GOLD NANOPARTICLES, METHODS FOR PREPARING SAME AND USES THEREOF FOR TREATING SOLID TUMOURS | [2022/22] | French: | STRUCTURES PARTICULAIRES À BASE DE NANOPARTICULES D'OR, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES TUMEURS SOLIDES | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 17.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006222595 (MUKHERJEE PRIYABRATA [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * example - * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2012007567 (UNIV DENMARK TECH DTU [DK], et al) [Y] 1-18 * example - * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2012124502 (DOSHISHA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18 * example 1 *; | [XI]CN107802844 (UNIV NATIONAL DONG HWA, et al) [X] 1-13 * example - * [I] 14-17; | [Y]US9974870 (ACHILEFU SAMUEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * example - * * claim - *; | [XI] - KRISTEN L. KOZIELSKI ET AL, "Bioengineered nanoparticles for siRNA delivery", WILEY INTERDISCIPLINARY REVIEWS: NANOMEDICINE AND NANOBIOTECHNOLOGY, (201309), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1002/wnan.1233, ISSN 1939-5116, pages 449 - 468, XP055160902 [X] 1-13 * page 451 * * page 460 - page 461 * [I] 14-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/wnan.1233 | [XI] - JAE-SEUNG LEE ET AL, "Gold, Poly(beta-amino ester) Nanoparticles for Small Interfering RNA Delivery", NANO LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1021/NL9009793, ISSN 1530-6984, (20090610), pages 2402 - 2406, (20090507), XP002629297 [X] 1-13 * abstract * * figure - * [I] 14-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl9009793 | [YD] - YANJIE WANG ET AL, "Biodegradable polymeric nanoparticles containing gold nanoparticles and Paclitaxel for cancer imaging and drug delivery using photoacoustic methods", BIOMEDICAL OPTICS EXPRESS, (20161001), vol. 7, no. 10, doi:10.1364/BOE.7.004125, ISSN 2156-7085, pages 4125 - 4138, XP055685984 [YD] 1-18 * abstract * * page 4130 - page 4132 * * page 4135, paragraph 3.3 - page 4136, line 2 * * page 4136, paragraph 3.5 - page 4138, paragraph Conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/BOE.7.004125 | [Y] - KUMAR KRISHAN ET AL, "Efficacious cellular codelivery of doxorubicin and EGFP siRNA mediated by the composition of PLGA and PEI protected gold nanoparticles", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20170818), vol. 27, no. 18, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2017.08.037, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 4288 - 4293, XP085185732 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 4290 * * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2017.08.037 | [Y] - PAGONIS T C ET AL, "Nanoparticle-based Endodontic Antimicrobial Photodynamic Therapy", JOURNAL OF ENDODONTICS, vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0099-2399, (20100201), pages 322 - 328, (20091216), XP026873895 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 323 - page 324, column l * * figure - * | [Y] - SEAN MARRACHE ET AL, "Immune stimulating photoactive hybrid nanoparticles for metastatic breast cancer", INTEGRATIVE BIOLOGY, (2013), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1039/C2IB20125A, ISSN 1757-9694, page 215, XP055141758 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 216, column r - page 217 * * page 220 - page 221 * * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C2IB20125A | [Y] - ANTONIO TOPETE ET AL, "Fluorescent Drug-Loaded, Polymeric-Based, Branched Gold Nanoshells for Localized Multimodal Therapy and Imaging of Tumoral Cells", ACS NANO, (20140325), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1021/nn406425h, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 2725 - 2738, XP055688320 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 2734 * * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn406425h | [Y] - JUNLONG GENG ET AL, "Conjugated Polymer and Gold Nanoparticle Co-loaded PLGA Nanocomposites with Eccentric Internal Nanostructure for Dual-modal Targeted Cellular Imaging", SMALL, (20120806), vol. 8, no. 15, doi:10.1002/smll.201102353, ISSN 1613-6810, pages 2421 - 2429, XP055338311 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 2427 * * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.201102353 | [YD] - G. LAURENT ET AL, "Minor changes in the macrocyclic ligands but major consequences on the efficiency of gold nanoparticles designed for radiosensitization", NANOSCALE, (2016), vol. 8, no. 23, doi:10.1039/C6NR01228K, ISSN 2040-3364, pages 12054 - 12065, XP055685923 [YD] 1-18 * abstract * * page 12059 - page 12061 * * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6NR01228K | [Y] - CHRISTOPHE ALRIC ET AL, "The biodistribution of gold nanoparticles designed for renal clearance", NANOSCALE, (20130424), vol. 5, no. 13, doi:10.1039/c3nr00012e, ISSN 2040-3364, page 5930, XP055368484 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 5933 * * figure - * * page 5937, column r, paragraph Conclusions - page 5938 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3nr00012e | [A] - JAMES F HAINFELD ET AL, "NOTE; The use of gold nanoparticles to enhance radiotherapy in mice; Gold nanoparticles for radiotherapy in mice", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (20040921), vol. 49, no. 18, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/49/18/N03, ISSN 0031-9155, pages N309 - N315, XP020023898 [A] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/49/18/N03 | by applicant | - J.F. HAINFELD et al., Phys. Med. Biol., (20040000), vol. 49, pages N309 - 315 | - GAUTIER LAURENT et al., Nanoscale, (20160000), vol. 8, pages 12054 - 6506 | - A.M. GOBIN et al., Nano Lett., (20070000), vol. 7, pages 1929 - 1934 | - J.F. HAINFELD et al., Br. J. Radiol., (20060000), vol. 79, pages 248 - 253 | - K.T. BUTTERWORTH et al., Nanoscale, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 4830 - 4838 | - M. BRUST et al., J. Chem. Soc. Chem, Commun., (19950000), vol. 0, pages 1655 - 1656 | - P.C.S. JOHN TURKEVICH, Discuss Faraday Soc, vol. 11, pages 55 - 75 | - M. YU et al., ACS nano, (20150000), vol. 9, pages 6655 - 6674 | - WANG Y et al., Biomed Opt Express, (20160000), vol. 7, pages 4125 - 4138 | - H. FESSI et al., International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (19890000), vol. 55, pages R1 - R4 |