EP4010741 - VELOCITY MODEL CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 501 Westlake Park Boulevard Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETGEN, John 150 W. Warrenville Road MC 200-1W Naperville, Illinois 60563 / US | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20757721.4 | 29.07.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020US44026 | Priority number, date | US201962884946P | 09.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962884946 P | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021030058 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4010741 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/30, G01V1/36 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
G01V1/303 (EP,US);
G01V1/282 (US);
G01V1/345 (US);
G01V1/362 (EP);
G01V2210/512 (EP);
G01V2210/6222 (EP);
G01V2210/64 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION EINES GESCHWINDIGKEITSMODELLS | [2022/24] | English: | VELOCITY MODEL CONSTRUCTION | [2022/24] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE MODÈLE DE VITESSE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 09.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009116336 (SUMMERFIELD PHILIP J [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15-20 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0012] - [0013] - [0019] - [0027] - [0052] - [0062]; figures 2,3,7,9 * [I] 14; | [A]US2015177401 (AMARU MAISHA LARA [US], et al) [A] 1,15,20* paragraphs [0022] - [0050]; figures 2,4 *; | [XI]US2015378039 (SUN YONGHE J [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15-20 * paragraphs [0020] - [0048]; figure 1 * [I] 14 |