EP4021795 - VESSEL OF MODULAR CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sleepdienst Adriaan Kooren B.V. Wilhelminakade 318 3072 AR Rotterdam / NL | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HOORN, Bastiaan Albert c/o Wilhelminakade 318 3072 AR Rotterdam / NL | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20757975.6 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020NL50474 | Priority number, date | NL20191043364 | 28.08.2019 Original published format: NL 1043364 | [2022/27] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021040514 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021795 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4021795 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/70 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B63B35/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIFF MIT MODULAREM AUFBAU | [2022/27] | English: | VESSEL OF MODULAR CONSTRUCTION | [2022/27] | French: | NAVIRE DE CONSTRUCTION MODULAIRE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 28.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 28.05.2024 | |
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2091264 (BERRY HARRY C); | [A]DE1191710 (VOITH GMBH J M); | [A]DE2156552 (KUIL THEODOR VAN DER); | [XI]US3858541 (METCALF JR JOHN C, et al); | [A]GB1567756 (BROWN & CO LTD G, et al); | [XI]US6598552 (ROUSE RICHARD W [US]); | [XI]US2007199498 (DAVIS TERRANCE G [US]); | [XI]US2011100285 (GISBORNE MONTGOMERY SCOTT [CA]); | [XI]CN107792310 (DEQING HAIDE YACHT CO LTD); | [XI]US2018154986 (VOGEL JACOB STEVEN [US], et al) |