EP4014367 - MEDIA SYSTEM AND METHOD OF GENERATING MEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sounderx Limited Elsley Court 20-22 Great Titchfield Street London W1W 8BE / GB | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICHOLSON, Paul Arthur c/o Sounder Global Limited Elsley Court 20-22 Great Titchfield Street London W1W 8BE / GB | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Scullion, Juliet Patricia Affiliate IP The Great Barn Gaddesden Row Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP2 6HG / GB | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20758286.7 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020GB51919 | Priority number, date | GB20190011585 | 13.08.2019 Original published format: GB 201911585 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028683 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4014367 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/05 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04H60/05 (EP);
H04N21/43072 (GB);
H04N21/2187 (US);
H04H60/04 (GB);
H04H60/07 (EP);
H04N21/233 (GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | MEDIENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON MEDIENINHALTEN | [2022/25] | English: | MEDIA SYSTEM AND METHOD OF GENERATING MEDIA CONTENT | [2022/25] | French: | SYSTÈME MULTIMÉDIA ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 10.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2013083133 (AUDUX APS [DK]) [Y] 4,13,17 * page 3, lines 10-29 ** page 18, line 11 - page 20, line 31 *; | [X]US2014192200 (ZAGRON GUY [IL]) [X] 1,12,16,21 * paragraphs [0006] , [0060] - [0062] *; | [XYI]US2016286282 (MARCK NEIL C [US]) [X] 1-3,5-12,16,18-22 * paragraphs [0011] , [0015] , [0019] - [0029] - [0038] , [0051] - [0057]; figure 1 * [Y] 4,13,17 [I] 14,15 |