EP3900382 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR PROCESSING IMAGE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sanguk 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Bongsoo 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Changho 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jungwon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
YEOM, Donghyun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20758487.1 | 18.02.2020 | [2021/43] | WO2020KR02347 | Priority number, date | KR20190019199 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190019199 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171565 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3900382 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/8549, H04N9/64, G06T5/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
G06T5/92 (EP,KR);
H04N21/8549 (KR);
G06T5/90 (US);
H04N9/643 (KR);
G06T2207/10016 (EP);
G06T2207/10024 (EP);
G06T2207/20208 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BILDVERARBEITUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES BILDVERARBEITUNGVERFAHREN | [2021/43] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR PROCESSING IMAGE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD THEREOF | [2021/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20050054729 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [Y] 11; | [A]KR20160040981 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])[A] 1-15; | [A]KR20160138865 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15; | [YX]US2016360171 (TAO LI [US], et al) [Y] 4-11,14-15 [X] 1-3,12-13; | [Y]US2017026646 (MINOO KOOHYAR [US], et al) [Y] 4-10,14-15 | by applicant | US2016360171 |