EP3927471 - STORAGE CONTAINER AND DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hight, Myra 1188 Jobs Peak Dr. South Lake Tahoe CA 96150 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte PartG mbB Magirus-Deutz-Straße 12 89077 Ulm / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20758638.9 | 18.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020US18707 | Priority number, date | US201962807358P | 19.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962807358 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020172200 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927471 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B05C11/10, A24F47/00, B65D83/00, A61M11/04, A24F40/00, A61M15/06 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A24F40/00 (EP);
B05B11/02 (US);
B05B11/0089 (US);
A61M11/041 (EP);
A61M15/06 (EP);
A61M2209/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | B05C11/10, A24F47/00, B65D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | LAGERBEHÄLTER UND SPENDER | [2021/52] | English: | STORAGE CONTAINER AND DISPENSER | [2021/52] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE STOCKAGE ET DISTRIBUTEUR | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 24.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010323322 (JESSOP NEIL [US], et al) [I] 1-9,15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1A-4B *; | [I]WO2013060827 (JT INT SA [CH]) [I] 1-9,15 * page 5, line 32 - page 8, line 17; figures 4,5 *; | [XI]GB2542007 (BEYOND TWENTY LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7,15 * page 9, line 14 - page 33, line 27; figures 1-16 * [I] 2-6,8,9; | [I]US2018086543 (VAN WHY RENAE [US]) [I] 1-9,15* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1A-3B * | International search | [Y]US2515956 (GREENBERG CHARLES J) [Y] 10, 17 * ; figure 1; column 4, lines 25-34 *; | [YA]US3674181 (MARKS JOSEPH D, et al) [Y] 7 * ; abstract; column 2, lines 72-75 * [A] 20; | [Y]US4403707 (CONNOR JOHN T [US]) [Y] 6 * ; figure 1; column 1, lines 6-11; column 4, lines 13-29 *; | [A]US2003006303 (IVEY ELLWOOD G [US], et al) [A] 20* ; abstract; paragraphs [0009]-[0010], [0017]-[0021 ] *; | [XYA] - CHIP QUICK, "Chip Quik SMD291AX REWORK SOLDER PASTE 5CC 63/37 NO CLEAN SOLDER", AMAZON.COM, (20100316), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.amazon.com/SMD291AX-REWORK-SOLDER-PASTE-CLEAN/dp/B0186IM0P0/ref=sr_1_1?dchild=1&keywords=Chip+Quik+SMD291AX+REWORK+SOLDER+PASTE+5CC+63%2F37+NO+CLEAN+SOLDER&qid=1593536032&sr=8-1, (20200628), XP055841395 [X] 12 * ; first page, image, second page, product description * [Y] 1, 6-7, 10, 13, 17-19 [A] 2-5, 8-9, 11, 14-16, 20 | [Y] - 247 SOLDER, "No Clean SnPb Leaded Solder Paste 15 Grams", AMAZON.COM, (20151109), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.amazon.com/Clean-Leaded-Solder-Paste-Grams/dp/B017RSZFQQ/ref=sr_1_2_sspa?dchild=1&keywords=No+Clean+SnPb+Leaded+Solder+Paste+15+Grams&qid=1593536999&sr=8-2-spons&psc=1&spLa=ZW5jcnlwdGVkUXVhbGlmaWVyPUEzRIJKQzRKWjM5SUZMJmVuY3J5cHRIZEIkPUEwMDAyNzc5Mk5FOVdFVVEwRFM3UyZIbmNyeX80ZWRBZElkPUEwOTUwMTc3MzdCVTFRNVIxQTMxTiZ3aWRnZXROYW1IPXNwX2F0ZiZhY3Rpb249Y2xpY2tSZWRpcmVjdCZkb05vdExvZONsaWNrPXRydWU=>title, (20200628), XP055841401 [Y] 1, 18-19 * ; first page, image * [] 20 | [A] - John Mohyi, "Syringe holders", MOHYILABS Gallery, MOHYILABS, page 1, MOHYILABS Gallery, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20180723200238/https://mohyilabs.com/gallery/, (20200628), XP009530044 [A] 2, 20 * ; first page, figure * | [A] - "Waxman Clear - Syringe Oil", CANNABIS VAPE REVIEWS.COM, (20160124), URL: https://cannabisvapereviews.com/waxman-clear-oil-syringe, (20200628), XP055735107 [A] 2, 20 * ; first page, image; second page * | [A] - Anonymous, "Silicone Dab Containers for Storing Wax Concentrates", THE VAPE VET STORE, (20190106), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://vapevetstore.com/collections/dab-containers, (20200628), XP055841410 [A] 2 |