EP3928025 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND MEDIA FOR MONITORING STEAM TRAPS FOR FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Latency, LLC 632 Main Street Hingham, MA 02043 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWENS, Peter 632 Main Street Hingham, MA 02043 / US | 02 /
MICALLEF, David West Winds Triq L-Iskultura Rabat RBT 4040 / MT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
OWENS, Peter Hingham, MA 02043 / US | ||
02 /
MICALLEF, David Rabat RBT 4040 / MT | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | Coates, Robert James Patterson Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20759519.0 | 20.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020US19095 | Priority number, date | US201962808113P | 20.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962808113 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020172452 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928025 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16T1/48, G06Q10/06 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
F16T1/48 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (US);
G06Q10/0637 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | F16T1/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND MEDIEN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON DAMPFFALLEN AUF FEHLER | [2021/52] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND MEDIA FOR MONITORING STEAM TRAPS FOR FAILURE | [2021/52] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET SUPPORTS POUR SURVEILLER DES PIÈGES À VAPEUR POUR DÉTERMINER UNE DÉFAILLANCE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/52] | 31.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 03.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 21.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6145529 (HELLMAN MICHAEL PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6571180 (TURNER JOHN M [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,9,11,15,17 * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2006118647 (CHESKATY REX [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2011316707 (GAINES MICHAEL H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10,12-14,16,18 * paragraphs [0025] - [0043]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 3,5,9,11,15,17; | [A]US2013173178 (POCZKA CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL ROLAND AGARD [GB], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014085100 (RICH CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]US2018217110 (OWENS PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6571180 (TURNER JOHN M [US], et al) [Y] 3, 9, 15 * : abstract, col 4 ,ln 8-13; col 7, In 6 -14 *; | [A]US2010153068 (ARMSTRONG DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * : see entire document *; | [XY]US2011316707 (GAINES MICHAEL H [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4-8, 10-14, 16-18 * : abstract, [0023], [0025], [0028], [0036], [0045] * [Y] 3, 9, 15; | [A]US2017370606 (CONNER BRIAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-18* : see entire document *; | [A]US2018128424 (FUJIWARA YOSHIYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * : see entire document * | by applicant | US6571180 | US2011316707 |