EP3928074 - ITERATIVE DIRECT EXPANSION MICROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARKAR, Deblina MIT Media Lab 20 Ames Street, E15-416 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
BOYDEN, Edward Stuart 9 Hallwood Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | 03 /
WASSIE, Asmamaw T. 41 Irving St., Apt. 4 Boston, MA 02114 / US | 04 /
KANG, Jinyoung 250 Kendall St., Apt. 303 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
SARKAR, Deblina Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
BOYDEN, Edward Stuart Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | |||
03 /
WASSIE, Asmamaw T. Boston, MA 02114 / US | |||
04 /
KANG, Jinyoung Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Representative(s) | Budde Schou A/S Dronningens Tvaergade 30 1302 Copenhagen K / DK | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20760091.7 | 19.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020US18789 | Priority number, date | US201962809062P | 22.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962809062 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020172247 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928074 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/30, G01N1/36, G01N1/28 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
G01N1/36 (EP,US);
G01N1/28 (US);
G01N1/286 (EP,US);
G01N2001/2873 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | G01N1/30, G01N1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | ITERATIVE DIREKTE EXPANSIONSMIKROSKOPIE | [2021/52] | English: | ITERATIVE DIRECT EXPANSION MICROSCOPY | [2021/52] | French: | MICROSCOPIE D'EXPANSION DIRECTE ITÉRATIVE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015127183 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0035] *; | [X]US2016305856 (BOYDEN EDWARD STUART [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0056] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2016304952 (BOYDEN EDWARD STUART [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0029] *; | [A]WO2017147435 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2016116384 (CHEN FEI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [X]US2016305856 (BOYDEN EDWARD STUART [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2017182220 (SONG JIE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [A]US10059990 (BOYDEN EDWARD STUART [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document * |