EP3929210 - CHIMERIC PROTEIN, METHOD OF PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF, AND ALSO A NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE, EXPRESSION CASSETTE, EXPRESSION VECTOR, HOST CELL, COMPOSITION FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS, KIT FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS AND METHOD OF DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS IN VITRO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fundação Oswaldo Cruz Avenida Brasil 4365 Manguinhos 21045-900 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NETO, Osvaldo, Pompílio, de Melo Rua Afonso de Albuquerque Melo, Nº420, Apto 802 PE 52060-450 Recife / BR | 02 /
REZENDE, Antonio, Mauro Rua Estrada das Ubaias, 200, Apto 1604, Bairro Casa Forte, PE 52061-080 Recife / BR | 03 /
TAVARES, Diego, de Hollanda, Cavalcanti Rua Monsenhor Júlio Maria, nº50, apt. 01, Madalena, PE 50720-090 Recife / BR | 04 /
DOS SANTOS, Wagner, José, Tenório Rua General Polidoro, 380, Várzea, PE 50740-050 Recife / BR | 05 /
NETO, Artur, Leonel, de Castro Rua Leonardo Da Vinci, 195, D408, Curado 2, PE 54220-000 Jabotão dos Guararapes / BR | 06 /
MAGALHÃES, Franklin, Barbalho Av. Conselheiro Rosa e Silva 999, ap 103, Aflitos PE 52050-020 Recife / BR | 07 /
DO NASCIMENTO, Marília, Barbosa Rua dos Alecrins, nº140, Centro, PE 54759-080 Camaragibe / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
NETO, Osvaldo, Pompílio, de Melo 52060-450 Recife / BR | ||
02 /
REZENDE, Antonio, Mauro 52061-080 Recife / BR | |||
03 /
TAVARES, Diego, de Hollanda, Cavalcanti 50720-090 Recife / BR | |||
04 /
DOS SANTOS, Wagner, José, Tenório 50740-050 Recife / BR | |||
05 /
NETO, Artur, Leonel, de Castro 54220-000 Jabotão dos Guararapes / BR | |||
06 /
MAGALHÃES, Franklin, Barbalho 52050-020 Recife / BR | |||
07 /
DO NASCIMENTO, Marília, Barbosa 54759-080 Camaragibe / BR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20760142.8 | 14.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020BR50044 | Priority number, date | BR20191003639 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: BR102019003639 | [2021/52] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020168402 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | PT | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929210 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/008, C07K14/44, C12N1/00, C12N15/62, C12N15/63, C12N15/70, G01N33/569 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP);
G01N33/569 (US);
A61K39/008 (EP,US);
C07K14/44 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
G01N33/56905 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/21 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | C07K14/44, C12N15/62, C12N15/63, A61K39/008, C12N1/00, G01N33/569 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | CHIMÄRES PROTEIN, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE VERWENDUNG, SOWIE EIN NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜL, EXPRESSIONSKASSETTE, EXPRESSIONSVEKTOR, WIRTSZELLE, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE DIAGNOSE VON LEISHMANIASIS, KIT ZUR DIAGNOSE VON LEISHMANIASIS UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON LEISHMANIASIS IN VITRO | [2021/52] | English: | CHIMERIC PROTEIN, METHOD OF PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF, AND ALSO A NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE, EXPRESSION CASSETTE, EXPRESSION VECTOR, HOST CELL, COMPOSITION FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS, KIT FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS AND METHOD OF DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS IN VITRO | [2021/52] | French: | PROTÉINE CHIMÈRE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION, ET MOLÉCULE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE, CASSETTE D'EXPRESSION, VECTEUR D'EXPRESSION, CELLULE HÔTE, COMPOSITION POUR DIAGNOSTIC DE LEISHMANIOSE, TROUSSE DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LEISHMANIOSE ET MÉTHODE DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LEISHMANIOSE IN VITRO | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2021 | Translation filed | 21.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0039298 (LETI LAB [ES], et al) [X] 1-5,7-20* the whole document *; | [X] - BOARINO A ET AL, "Development of recombinant chimeric antigen expressing immunodominant B epitopes of Leishmania infantum for serodiagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis", CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200505), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.1128/CDLI.12.5.647-653.2005, ISSN 1071-412X, pages 647 - 653, XP002547231 [X] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.12.5.647-653.2005 | [X] - FARIA ANGÉLICA ROSA ET AL, "Novel Recombinant Multiepitope Proteins for the Diagnosis of Asymptomatic Leishmania infantum-Infected Dogs", PLOS NEGLECTED TROPICAL DISEASES, vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pntd.0003429, (201501), page e3429, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC4287523/pdf/pntd.0003429.pdf, XP055973813 [X] 1-5,7-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pntd.0003429 | International search | [A]WO2010108245 (FUNDACAO OSWALDO CRUZ [BR], et al) [A] 1, 2, 9 and 17* Abstract, Figures 1 and 3. *; | [X] - SANTOS, W. J. T., "Otimização das condições para superexpressão em Escherichia coli de proteínas quimericas com potencial para diagnóstico da leishmaniose visceral. Recife", Dissertação (mestrado) - Universidade Federal de Pernambuco. Recife, (20150000), page 80, XP055506877 [X] 1, 2, 9 a 17 * Abstract, section "Materials and Methods", last paragraph page 46, section "Conclusions", Figures 12 and 14 to 17. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5AY00453E | [X] - BOARINO, A. et al., "Development of recombinant chimeric antigen expressing immunodominant B epitopes of Leishmania infantum for serodiagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis", Clin Diagn Lab Immunol, (20050000), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.1128/CDLI.12.5.647-653.2005, pages 647 - 53, XP002547231 [X] 1, 2, 9 a 17 * cited in the description. Abstract, section "Materials and Methods", Figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.12.5.647-653.2005 | [X] - FARIA, A. R. et al., "Novel recombinant multiepitope proteins for the diagnosis of asymptomatic leishmania infantum-infected dogs", PLoS Negl Trop Dis, (20150000), vol. 9, no. 1, page e3429, XP055506877 [X] 1, 2, 9 and 17 * cited in the description. Abstract, section "Methods", Figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5AY00453E | [X] - SOTO, M. et al., "Multicomponent chimeric antigen for serodiagnosis of canine visceral leishmaniasis", J Clin Microbiol, (19980000), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 58 - 63, XP002547231 [X] 1, 2, 9 and 17 * . PMCID: PMC124807. cited in the description. Abstract, section "Materials and Methods", Figure 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.12.5.647-653.2005 | [X] - DIAS, D. S. et al., "Vaccination with a CD 4+ and CD 8+ T- cell epitopes-based recombinant chimeric protein derived from Leishmania infantum proteins confers protective immunity against visceral leishmaniasis", Transl Res, (20180000), vol. 200, pages 18 - 34, XP085489721 [X] 1, 2, 9 and 17 * Abstract, section "Materials and Methods", Figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.trsl.2018.05.001 | [A] - OLIVEIRA, G. G. et al., "Characterization of novel Leishmania infantum recombinant proteins encoded by genes from five families with distinct capacities for serodiagnosis of canine and human visceral leishmaniasis", Am J Trop Med Hyg., vol. 85, no. 6, page 2011, XP055733941 [A] 1, 2, 9 and 17 * cited in the description. Abstract, Table 1, Figures 1 and 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4269/ajtmh.2011.11-0102 | [A] - MAGALHAES, F. B. et al., "Evaluation of a new set of recombinant antigens for the serological diagnosis of human and canine visceral leishmaniasis", PLoS One. 2017, vol. 12, no. 9, page e0184867, XP002547231 [A] 1, 2, 9 and 17 * cited in the description. Abstract, section "Materials and Methods", Table 1, Figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.12.5.647-653.2005 | by applicant | - T.E. CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structures and Molecular Properties, Blackwell Scientific Publications, (19930000), vol. I-IV | - AKHOUNDI, M et al., "A Historical Overview of the Classification, Evolution, and Dispersion of Leishmania Parasites and Sandflies", PLoS Neglected Tropical Diseases, (20160000), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 1 - 40 | - AVLAR, J et al., "Leishmaniasis worldwide and global estimates of its incidence", PLoS ONE, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 5 | - BARROUIN-MELO, S. M. et al., "Can spleen aspirations be safely used for the parasitological diagnosis of canine visceral leishmaniosis? A study on asymptomatic and poly symptomatic animals", Veterinary Journal, (20060000), vol. 171, no. 2, pages 331 - 339 | - BOARINO, A et al., "Development of Recombinant Chimeric Antigen Expressing Immunodominant B Epitopes of Leishmania infantum for SeroVisceral Leishmaniasis diagnosis", Clinical and Vaccine Immunology, (20050000), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 647 - 653 | - BOELAERT, M et al., "A comparative study of the effectiveness of diagnostic tests for visceral leishmaniasis", Am.J.Trop.Med.Hyg., (20040100), vol. 70, no. 1, pages 72 - 77 | - BOELAERT, M et al., "Rapid tests for the diagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis in patients with suspected disease. Cochrane", Database.Syst.Rev., (20140000), vol. 6, no. 1469-493X, page CD009135 | - BOURDEAU, P et al., "Management of canine leishmaniosis in endemic SW European regions: a questionnaire-based multinational survey", Parasites & Vectors, (20140000), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-3305-7-110, page 110, XP021183743 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-3305-7-110 | - CAMPOS, R. M. et al., "Distinct mitochondrial HSP70 homologues conserved in various Leishmania species suggest novel biological functions", Molecular and Biochemical Parasitology, (20080000), vol. 160, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.molbiopara.2008.04.013, pages 157 - 162, XP022757372 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molbiopara.2008.04.013 | - CAMUSSONE, C et al., "Comparison of recombinant Trypanosoma cruzi peptide mixtures versus multiepitope chimeric proteins as sensitizing antigens for immunodiagnosis", Clinical and Vaccine Immunology, (20090000), vol. 16, no. 6, doi:10.1128/CVI.00005-09, pages 899 - 905, XP055236039 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00005-09 | - CANAVATE, C. et al., "Evaluation of two rK39 dipstick tests, direct agglutination test, and indirect fluorescent antibody test for diagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis in a new epidemic site in highland Ethiopia", American Journal of Tropical Medicine and Hygiene, (20110000), vol. 84, no. 1, pages 102 - 106 | - CHAPPUIS, F et al., "A meta-analysis of the diagnostic performance of the direct agglutination test and rK39 dipstick for visceral leishmaniasis", BMJ, (20060000), vol. 333, no. 7571, page 723 | - CHAPPUIS, F et al., "Visceral leishmaniasis: what are the needs for diagnosis, treatment and control?", Nat.Rev.Microbiol., (20071100), vol. 5, no. 1740-1534, doi:10.1038/nrmicro1748, pages 873 - 882, XP037134970 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro1748 | - DE RUITER, C. M. et al., "Molecular tools for diagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis: systematic review and meta-analysis of diagnostic test accuracy", J.Clin.Microbiol., (20140900), vol. 52, no. 1098-660X, pages 3147 - 3155 | - EL-MANZALAWY, Y.; DOBBS, D.; HONAVAR, V, "Predicting linear B-cell epitopes using string kernels", Journal of Molecular Recognition, (20080700), vol. 21, no. 4, doi:10.1002/JMR.893, pages 243 - 255, XP002548170 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/JMR.893 | - FARIA, A. R. et al., "Novel Recombinant Multiepitope Proteins for the Diagnosis of Asymptomatic Leishmania infantum-Infected Dogs", PLoS Neglected Tropical Diseases, (20150000), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 13 - 16 | - FRAGA, D. B. M. et al., "A multicentric evaluation of the recombinant Leishmania infantum antigen-based immunochromatographic assay for the serodiagnosis of canine visceral leishmaniasis", Parasit. Vectors, (20140000), vol. 7, no. 1756-3305, doi:10.1186/1756-3305-7-136, page 136, XP021183763 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-3305-7-136 | - FRAGA, D. B. M. et al., "The Rapid Test Based on Leishmania infantum Chimeric rK28 Protein Improves the Diagnosis of Canine Visceral Leishmaniasis by Reducing the Detection of False-Positive Dogs", PLoS Neglected Tropical Diseases, (20160000), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 1 - 11 | - GOMES, Y. M. et al., "Diagnosis of canine visceral leishmaniasis: Biotechnological advances", Veterinary Journal, (20080000), vol. 175, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.tvjl.2006.10.019, pages 45 - 52, XP022439477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tvjl.2006.10.019 | - KAMHAWI, S, "Phlebotomine sand flies and Leishmania parasites: friends or foes?", Trends in Parasitology, (20060000), vol. 22, no. 9, doi:10.1016/j.pt.2006.06.012, pages 439 - 445, XP028058844 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pt.2006.06.012 | - KAYE, P.SCOTT, P, "Leishmaniasis: complexity at the host-pathogen interface", Nature reviews. Microbiology, (20110000), vol. 9, no. 8, pages 604 - 615 | - MAGELLAN, F. et al., "Evaluation of a new set of recombinant antigens for the serological diagnosis of human and canine visceral leishmaniasis", PLoS ONE, (20170000), vol. 12, no. 9, page e0184867 | - METTLER, M et al., "Evaluation of enzyme-linked immunosorbent assays, an immunofluorescent-antibody test, and two rapid tests (immunochromatographic-dipstick and gel tests) for serological diagnosis of symptomatic and asymptomatic Leishmania infections in dogs", J.Clin.Microbiol., (20051100), vol. 43, no. 0095-1137, doi:10.1128/JCM.43.11.5515-5519.2005, pages 5515 - 5519, XP002531889 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.43.11.5515-5519.2005 | - MURRAY, H. W. et al., "Advances in leishmaniasis", Lancet, (20051000), vol. 366, no. 1474-547X, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(05)67629-5, pages 1561 - 1577, XP025277339 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(05)67629-5 | - NOLI, C.SARIDOMICHELAKIS, M. N., "An update on the diagnosis and treatment of canine leishmaniosis caused by Leishmania infantum (syn. L. chagasi", The Veterinary Journal, (20140000), vol. 202, no. 3, pages 425 - 435 | - OLIVEIRA, G. G. et al., "Characterization of novel Leishmania infantum recombinant proteins encoded by genes from five families with distinct capacities for serodiagnosis of canine and human visceral leishmaniasis", Am.J.Trop.Med.Hyg., (20111200), vol. 85, no. 1476-1645, doi:10.4269/ajtmh.2011.11-0102, pages 1025 - 1034, XP055733941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4269/ajtmh.2011.11-0102 | - PACE, D, Leishmaniasis. Journal of Infection, (20140000), vol. 69, no. SI, pages S10 - S18 | - PALTRINIERI, S et al., "Laboratory tests for diagnosing and monitoring canine leishmaniasis", Veterinary Clinical Pathology, (20160000), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 552 - 578 | - PATTABHI, S et al., "Design, development and evaluation of rK28-based point-of-care tests for improving rapid diagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis", PLoS Neglected Tropical Diseases, (20100000), vol. 4, no. 9 | - PEIXOTO, H. M.; DE OLIVEIRA, M. R. F.; ROMERO, G. A. S., "Serological diagnosis of canine visceral leishmaniasis in Brazil: systematic review and meta-analysis", Tropical Medicine & International Health, (20150000), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 334 - 352 | - QUINNELL, R. J. et al., "Evaluation of rK39 rapid diagnostic tests for canine visceral leishmaniasis: longitudinal study and meta-analysis", PLoS.Negl.Trop.Dis., vol. 7, no. 1935-2735 | - QUINNELL, R. J.COURTENAY, O, "Transmission, reservoir hosts and control of zoonotic visceral leishmaniasis", Parasitology, (20090000), vol. 136, no. 14, page 1915 | - READY, P. D., "Biology of Phlebotomine Sand Flies as Vectors of Disease Agents", Annual Review of Entomology, (20130000), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 227 - 250 | - SARIDOMICHELAKIS, M. N., "Advances in the pathogenesis of canine leishmaniosis: Epidemiologic and diagnostic implications", Veterinary Dermatology, (20090000), vol. 20, no. 5-6, pages 471 - 489 | - SINGH, O. P.SUNDAR, S, Developments in Diagnosis of Visceral Leishmaniasis in the Elimination Era, (20150000), vol. 2015 | - SINGH, S et al., "Diagnostic and prognostic value of K39 recombinant antigen in Indian leishmaniasis", J.Parasitol., (19951200), vol. 81, no. 0022-3395, doi:10.1007/BF00931510, pages 1000 - 1003, XP008011395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00931510 | - SOTO, M et al., "Multicomponent chimeric antigen for serodiagnosis of canine visceral leishmaniasis", Journal of Clinical Microbiology, (19980000), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 58 - 63 | - SRIVASTAVA, P et al., "Diagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis", Trans.R.Soc.Trop.Med.Hyg., (20110100), vol. 105, no. 1878-3503, pages 1 - 6, XP027538645 | - SRIVASTAVA, S et al., "Possibilities and challenges for developing a successful vaccine for leishmaniasis", Parasites & Vectors, (20160000), vol. 9, no. 1, page 277 | - SRIVIDYA, G et al., "Diagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis: developments over the last decade", Parasitol.Res., (20120300), vol. 110, no. 1432-1955, pages 1065 - 1078 | - SUNDAR, S et al., "Rapid accurate field diagnosis of Indian visceral leishmaniasis", Lancet, (19980000), vol. 351, no. 9102, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(97)04350-X, pages 563 - 565, XP004832005 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(97)04350-X | - SUNDAR, S.RAI, M, "Laboratory diagnosis of visceral leishmaniasis", Clin.Diagn.Lab Immunol., (20020900), vol. 9, no. 1071-412X, pages 951 - 958 | - WELCH, M et al., Designing genes for successful protein expression, Elsevier Inc., (20110000), vol. 498 |