EP4013517 - MOBILE FLUID EXPULSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faurecia Systèmes d'Echappement 23-27 Avenue des Champs Pierreux 92000 Nanterre / FR | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PODKOLINSKI, Thomas 11 Drakes Park Wellington Somerset TA21 8TB / GB | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20760399.4 | 13.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020EP72783 | Priority number, date | GB20190011641 | 14.08.2019 Original published format: GB 201911641 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028542 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4013517 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4013517 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A62C99/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
A62C99/0018 (EP);
B05B9/005 (GB,US);
B05B9/002 (GB,US);
B05B1/08 (EP,US);
B05B1/24 (EP,US);
B05B7/0006 (EP,GB);
B05B7/166 (GB);
B05D1/02 (US);
A62C31/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | A62C2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE FLUID EXPULSIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/17] | English: | MOBILE FLUID EXPULSION DEVICE | [2022/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXPULSION DE FLUIDE MOBILE | [2023/17] |
Former [2022/25] | MOBILE FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSSTOSSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2022/25] | DISPOSITIF MOBILE D'EXPULSION DE FLUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 11.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2343104 (UNIV LEEDS [GB]) [X] 1-4,7,18-20* the whole document * | by applicant | EP2343104 |