EP4179464 - A METHOD OF FORMING A PRELAM BODY OF A SMART CARD, A METHOD OF FORMING A SMART CARD, A PRELAM BODY, AND A SMART CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linxens Holding 37 rue des Closeaux 78200 Mantes-la-Jolie / FR | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOERING, Sven 01099 Dresden / DE | 02 /
KLEMM, Lars 01099 Dresden / DE | 03 /
NIELAND, Carsten 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 20760524.7 | 07.07.2020 | [2023/20] | WO2020IB00591 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022008941 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179464 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4179464 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K19/077 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
G06K19/07722 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/0772 (EP,KR);
G06K19/072 (EP,KR);
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06K19/07718 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07754 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VORLAM-KÖRPERS EINER CHIPKARTE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER CHIPKARTE, VORLAM-KÖRPER UND CHIPKARTE | [2023/20] | English: | A METHOD OF FORMING A PRELAM BODY OF A SMART CARD, A METHOD OF FORMING A SMART CARD, A PRELAM BODY, AND A SMART CARD | [2023/20] | French: | A METHOD OF FORMING A PRELAM BODY OF A SMART CARD, A METHOD OF FORMING A SMART CARD, A PRELAM BODY, AND A SMART CARD | [2023/25] |
Former [2023/20] | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN CORPS PRÉ-STRATIFIÉ D'UNE CARTE À PUCE, PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UNE CARTE À PUCE, CORPS PRÉ-STRATIFIÉ ET CARTE À PUCE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 10.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2068274 (GEMPLUS [FR], et al); | [Y]US2009184166 (BHANDARKAR SARVOTHAM [US], et al); | [XAYI]WO2018158644 (LINXENS HOLDING [FR]) |