EP4003961 - SMALL MOLECULE INHIBITORS OF ACETYL COENZYME A SYNTHETASE SHORT CHAIN 2 (ACSS2) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curadev Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. B-87 Sector 83 Phase II Noida 201305 / IN | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASU, Sourav c/o Curadev Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. B-87 Sector 83 Noida Uttar Pradesh 201305 / IN | 02 /
YADAV, B., Dharmendra c/o Curadev Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. B-87 Sector 83 Noida Uttar Pradesh 201305 / IN | 03 /
GHOSH, Rajib c/o Curadev Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. B-87 Sector 83 Noida Uttar Pradesh 201305 / IN | 04 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Ritesh c/o Curadev Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. B-87 Sector 83 Noida Uttar Pradesh 201305 / IN | 05 /
MIDDYA, Sandip c/o Curadev Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. B-87 Sector 83 Noida Uttar Pradesh 201305 / IN | 06 /
PRYDE, David c/o Curadev Pharma Ltd. Innovation House Discovery Park Sandwich Kent CT13 9ND / GB | 07 /
BANERJEE, Monali c/o Curadev Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. B-87 Sector 83 Noida Uttar Pradesh 201305 / IN | 08 /
SURYA, Arjun c/o Curadev Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. B-87 Sector 83 Noida Uttar Pradesh 201305 / IN | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Petty, Catrin Helen, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20760536.1 | 24.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020IB57007 | Priority number, date | GB20190010624 | 25.07.2019 Original published format: GB 201910624 | IN201911030106 | 25.07.2019 Original published format: IN201911030106 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021014415 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4003961 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/233, C07D215/38 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
C07D215/38 (EP,US);
C07D215/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/47 (US);
A61K31/4706 (KR);
A61K47/549 (EP);
A61K47/62 (US);
A61K47/64 (EP);
A61K47/6803 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP,KR);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D215/233 (EP,KR,US);
C07D215/42 (EP,KR);
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (KR,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN KLEINER MOLEKÜLE VON ACETYL-COENZYM A SYNTHETASE-KURZKETTEN 2 (ACSS2) | [2022/22] | English: | SMALL MOLECULE INHIBITORS OF ACETYL COENZYME A SYNTHETASE SHORT CHAIN 2 (ACSS2) | [2022/22] | French: | INHIBITEURS À PETITES MOLÉCULES DE L'ACÉTYL-COENZYME A SYNTHÉTASE À CHAÎNE COURTE 2 (ACSS2) | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 25.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2650226 (HANS ANDERSAG, et al); | [X]EP0507594 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [X]EP1072263 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [X]WO0153274 (AGOURON PHARMA [US]); | [X]WO03045313 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [X]WO03045920 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2004014860 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2007093402 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2011082270 (ARQULE INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2011119693 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2012080284 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [X]EP2727920 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | [I]WO2019067528 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]); | by applicant | US105540 | US4816567 | WO9111172 | WO9402518 | WO9855148 | WO0035298 | US6106864 | WO2004042083 | US2005271615 | US2006116422 | US2008050310 | WO2008052187 | US7521541 |