EP4022312 - METHOD OF ISOLATING CIRCULATING NUCLEOSOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belgian Volition Srl Rue Phocas Lejeune 22 5032 Isnes / BE | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECCLESTON, Mark Edward c/o Belgian Volition SPRL 22 Rue Phocas Lejeune 5032 Isnes / BE | 02 /
MICALLEF, Jacob Vincent c/o Belgian Volition SPRL 22 Rue Phocas Lejeune 5032 Isnes / BE | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Pond, Elizabeth Grace Catherine Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20760875.3 | 27.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020EP74026 | Priority number, date | GB20190012251 | 27.08.2019 Original published format: GB 201912251 | GB20190016735 | 18.11.2019 Original published format: GB 201916735 | GB20200006547 | 04.05.2020 Original published format: GB 202006547 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021038010 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022312 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, G01N33/68, C12Q1/6886 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G01N33/6875 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/6886 (CN,US);
C12Q1/6804 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
G01N33/57488 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/6851 (US);
C12Q2563/131 (IL,KR);
C12Q2565/531 (IL);
C12Q2600/154 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2565/531 (EP);
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2565/531, C12Q2563/131 (CN);
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2565/531 (EP);
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2565/531, C12Q2563/131 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG ZIRKULIERENDER NUKLEOSOMEN | [2022/27] | English: | METHOD OF ISOLATING CIRCULATING NUCLEOSOMES | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ISOLEMENT DE NUCLÉOSOMES CIRCULANTS | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 14.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2017068371 (BELGIAN VOLITION SPRL [BE]) [ID] 1-3,9-14,19-22 * page 8, paragraph last - page 9, paragraph first; claims 1-21 *; | [A] - SAKAMOTO J ET AL, "Immunoprecipitation of nucleosomal DNA is a novel procedure to improve the sensitivity of serum screening for the p16 hypermethylation associated with colon cancer", CANCER EPIDEMIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 34, no. 2, ISSN 1877-7821, (20100401), pages 194 - 199, (20100202), XP026993084 [A] 1-5,9-14,19-22 * page 195, column l, paragraph last - column r, paragraph first * | [A] - A. T. J. I. GO ET AL, "Non-invasive aneuploidy detection using free fetal DNA and RNA in maternal plasma: recent progress and future possibilities", HUMAN REPRODUCTION UPDATE, (20101112), vol. 17, no. 3, doi:10.1093/humupd/dmq054, ISSN 1355-4786, pages 372 - 382, XP055052831 [A] 1-5,9-14,19-22 * page 379, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humupd/dmq054 | [A] - MATTHEW?W. SNYDER ET AL, "Cell-free DNA Comprises an In?Vivo Nucleosome Footprint that Informs Its Tissues-Of-Origin", CELL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160114), vol. 164, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2015.11.050, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 57 - 68, XP055367434 [A] 1-5,9-14,19-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2015.11.050 | [A] - LOUISE RASMUSSEN ET AL, "Circulating cell-free nucleosomes as biomarkers for early detection of colorectal cancer", ONCOTARGET, United States, (20180213), vol. 9, no. 12, doi:10.18632/oncotarget.21908, ISSN 1949-2553, XP055656897 [A] 1-5,9-14,19-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18632/oncotarget.21908 | [A] - GERBEN MARSMAN ET AL, "Extracellular histones, cell-free DNA, or nucleosomes: differences in immunostimulation", CELL DEATH AND DISEASE, (20161208), vol. 7, no. 12, doi:10.1038/cddis.2016.410, page e2518, XP055333785 [A] 1-5,9-14,19-22 * page 6, column r, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cddis.2016.410 | by applicant | WO2005019826 | WO2013030577 | WO2013030579 | WO2013030578 | WO2013084002 | WO2017068371 | - BAO et al., EMBO J., (20040000), vol. 23, pages 3314 - 3324 | - BONISCH et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20120000), vol. 40, no. 13, pages 5951 - 5964 | - BOWERMANWERESZCZYNSKI, Biophys. J., (20160000), vol. 110, pages 327 - 337 | - CHURCH et al., Gut, (20140000), vol. 63, pages 317 - 325 | - CONDE E SILVA et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20070000), vol. 370, pages 555 - 573 | - CROWLEY et al., Nat. Rev. Clin. Oncol., (20130000), vol. 10, no. 8, pages 472 - 484 | - DAI et al., J. Vis. Exp., (20110000), vol. 50, page 2593 | - DHAENENS et al., Bioessays, (20140000), vol. 37, pages 70 - 79 | - DHASARATHYWADE, Mutat Res., (20080000), vol. 647, pages 39 - 43 | - FONG et al., Clin. Chem., (20090000), vol. 55, no. 3, pages 587 - 589 | - GUERRERO-PRESTON et al., Epigenetics, (20070000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 223 - 226 | - HOLDENRIEDER et al., Int. J. Cancer (Pred. Oncol., (20010000), vol. 95, pages 114 - 120 | - HOLDENRIEDERSTIEBER, Crit. Rev. Clin. Lab. Sci., (20090000), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 1 - 24 | - JUNG et al., Clin. Chimica Acta., (20100000), vol. 411, pages 1611 - 1624 | - MOULIERE et al., Sci Transl Med., (20180000), vol. 10, page 466 | - NALABOTHULA et al., BMC Genomics, (20140000), vol. 15, page 92 | - NEWMAN et al., Nat. Med., (20140000), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 548 - 554 | - SALGAME et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 680 - 681 | - SCHRADER et al., PLoS ONE, (20150000), vol. 10, no. 10, page e0140076 | - SCHWARZENBACH et al., Nat. Rev. Cancer, (20110000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 426 - 437 | - SINA et al., Nat. Comm., (20180000), vol. 9, page 4915 | - SNYDER et al., Cell, (20160000), vol. 164, pages 57 - 68 | - SOARES et al., Cancer, (19990000), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 112 - 118 | - SULTANOV et al., AIMS Genetics, (20170000), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 21 - 31 | - VAN NIEUWENHUIJZE et al., Ann. Rheum. Dis., (20030000), vol. 62, pages 10 - 14 | - WIESLERWEINZIERL, Methods Mol. Biol., Humana Press, (20150000), vol. 1286, pages 97 - 106 | - YANG et al., Int. J. Oncol., (20180000), vol. 52, no. 4, pages 1235 - 1245 | - YIKIM, BMB Reports, (20180000), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 211 - 218 | - ZHOU et al., Semin. Oncol., (20120000), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 440 - 448 |