EP3977048 - DETERMINING THE THICKNESS PROFILE OF WORK PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states John Bean Technologies Corporation 70 West Madison Street, Suite 4400 Chicago, IL 60602 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFANSTIEL, David 208 Harbor Ridge Canton, Georgia 30114 / US | 02 /
HOLMES, Daniel Apartment 3341, 821 Ralph McGill Boulevard NE Atlanta, Georgia 30306 / US | 03 /
STOCKARD, Richard D. 7315 126th Avenue Kirkland, Washington 98033 / US | 04 /
VOGELEY, JR., Arthur W. 16429 63rd Avenue W Lynnwood, Washington 98037 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20760962.9 | 28.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020US34889 | Priority number, date | US201962855700P | 31.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962855700 P | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020243280 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977048 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977048 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25, G01B15/04, A22C17/00, B23Q17/24 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G01B11/2522 (EP);
G06T7/0004 (CN,US);
A22C17/0086 (EP,US);
B26D5/00 (CN);
B26D5/007 (US);
B26D7/0625 (US);
B26F3/004 (US);
G01B11/06 (US);
G01B15/02 (US);
G01B15/045 (EP);
G01N23/083 (US);
G01N33/12 (US);
G06T7/13 (CN);
G06T7/62 (US);
B26D2210/02 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DES DICKENPROFILS VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [2022/14] | English: | DETERMINING THE THICKNESS PROFILE OF WORK PRODUCTS | [2022/14] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DU PROFIL D'ÉPAISSEUR DE PRODUITS À TRAVAILLER | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 22.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5960104 (CONNERS RICHARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * column 12, line 61 - column 31, line 42 * * figures 1, 2, 5-7 *; | [A]WO2017093539 (MAREL ICELAND EHF [IS]) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * page 8, line 7 - page 14, line 4 ** figures 3-5 *; | [AD]US2018029246 (BLAINE GEORGE R [US], et al) [AD] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0135] * * figures 1, 6, 7 * | by applicant | US4875254 | US4962568 | US5365186 | US5585603 | US5868056 | US6854590 | US2018029246 |