EP4017384 - PUNCTURE NEEDLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614-5688 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRAY, Daniel James Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | 02 /
MYERS, Lillian Grace Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | 03 /
TRAN, Don Huy 14352 Jacaranda Lane Westminster, CA 92683 / US | 04 /
VALDEZ, Michael G. Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | 05 /
MAY, Andrew Charles Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20761436.3 | 11.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020US45713 | Priority number, date | US201962890528P | 22.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962890528 P | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021034537 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017384 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61M25/06, A61B17/20 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/3478 (EP,CN);
A61B17/3468 (US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,CN);
A61B17/3209 (EP,CN);
A61M25/0082 (US);
A61M25/0662 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/00247 (EP,CN);
A61B2090/0801 (EP,CN);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | PUNKTIONSNADELN | [2022/26] | English: | PUNCTURE NEEDLES | [2022/26] | French: | AIGUILLES DE PONCTION | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002198501 (KUMAR MATTHEW M [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 1A, 1B *; | [A]US2005267490 (SECREST DEAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0033]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2006074398 (WHITING JAMES S [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 2,2A *; | [X]EP1962720 (NEOTRACT INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * figures 3U, 3V, 3W * * page 27, lines 12,13 * * page 37, lines 27-29 * * page 38, lines 6-8 *; | [X]US2012265229 (ROTTENBERG DAN [IL], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 2 * |