EP4028737 - FLEXIBLE PASSIVE ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yageo Nexensos GmbH Reinhard-Heraeus-Ring 23 63801 Kleinostheim / DE | [2023/24] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Heraeus Nexensos GmbH Reinhard-Heraeus-Ring 23 63801 Kleinostheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Christian c/o Heraeus Holding GmbH Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | 02 /
ASMUS, Tim c/o Heraeus Nexensos GmbH Reinhard-Heraeus-Ring 23 63801 Kleinostheim / DE | 03 /
DIETMANN, Stefan c/o Heraeus Nexensos GmbH Reinhard-Heraeus-Ring 23 63801 Kleinostheim / DE | 04 /
NICK, Christoph c/o Heraeus Nexensos GmbH Heraeus-Ring-23 63801 Kleinostheim / DE | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Kilchert, Jochen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20761615.2 | 01.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020EP74315 | Priority number, date | EP20190196138 | 09.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19196138 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021047948 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028737 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01K13/00, H01L23/498 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G01K13/00 (EP,KR);
G01K7/16 (CN,KR,US);
G01D5/16 (CN,US);
H01L23/147 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/15 (EP,KR);
H01L23/4985 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE PASSIVE ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/29] | English: | FLEXIBLE PASSIVE ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2022/29] | French: | COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE PASSIF FLEXIBLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/29] | COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE PASSIF SOUPLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 06.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009008132 (TAKASAWA RYOICHI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2012112347 (ECKHARDT HELMUT [US], et al); | [A]US2017127944 (SUN CAIMING [HK]) | by applicant | US9209047 |