EP4026027 - PROVENANCE VERIFICATION FOR SELECTIVE DISCLOSURE OF ATTRIBUTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARMUSEAU, Adriaan, Joris, H. c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20761861.2 | 02.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP74393 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN104740 | 06.09.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/104740 | EP20190202825 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19202825 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043789 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026027 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4026027 | Date: | 06.11.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, G06F21/44, G06F21/62, G06F21/64, H04L9/32 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H04L9/0894 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (US);
G06F21/44 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06F21/64 (EP);
H04L9/085 (US);
H04L9/3218 (EP);
H04L9/3221 (US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L2209/88 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | G06F21/44, G06F21/62, G06F21/64, H04L29/06, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERKUNFTSVERIFIZIERUNG FÜR SELEKTIVE OFFENBARUNG VON ATTRIBUTEN | [2022/28] | English: | PROVENANCE VERIFICATION FOR SELECTIVE DISCLOSURE OF ATTRIBUTES | [2022/28] | French: | VÉRIFICATION DE PROVENANCE POUR LA DIVULGATION SÉLECTIVE D'ATTRIBUTS | [2024/16] |
Former [2022/28] | VÉRIFICATION DE PROVENANCE POUR DIVULGATION SÉLECTIVE D'ATTRIBUTS | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 06.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2012303616 (ABUELSAAD TAMER E [US], et al); | [A]WO2014075836 (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE]); | by applicant | US4995082 |