EP3931981 - NUMBER OF NON-ZERO COEFFICIENTS REPORTING FOR TYPE II CSI CODEBOOK WITH FREQUENCY COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAO, Chenxi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WEI, Chao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
WU, Liangming 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
HAO, Chenxi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
WEI, Chao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Yu San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
WU, Liangming San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20762511.2 | 22.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020CN76308 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN76043 | 25.02.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/076043 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020173402 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3931981 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/0456, H04L5/00 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H04L5/0057 (EP);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0456 (EP);
H04B7/063 (US);
H04B7/0639 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | ANZAHL VON NICHT-NULL-KOEFFIZIENTEN-MELDUNG FÜR EIN TYP II-CSI-CODEBUCH MIT FREQUENZKOMPRESSION | [2022/01] | English: | NUMBER OF NON-ZERO COEFFICIENTS REPORTING FOR TYPE II CSI CODEBOOK WITH FREQUENCY COMPRESSION | [2022/01] | French: | RAPPORT DE COEFFICIENTS NON NULS POUR LIVRE DE CODES DE CSI DE TYPE II AVEC COMPRESSION DE FRÉQUENCE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Discussion on Type II CSI compression", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20181112 - 20181116, (20181108), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1813871 CSI ENHANCEMENTS_R2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F95/Docs/R1%2D1813871%2Ezip, (20181108), XP051480076 [X] 1,3,15 * pages 2-6 * * figures 1, 2, 5 * [Y] 5-12 [I] 2,4,13,14,16 | [XYI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on CSI enhancement for MU-MIMO", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chengdu, China; 20181008 - 20181012, (20180929), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1810103, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94b/Docs/R1%2D1810103%2Ezip, (20180929), XP051517518 [X] 1,3,15 * sections 3, 4; pages 2-8 * [Y] 5-12 [I] 2,4,13,14,16 | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "CSI Enhancement for MU-MIMO Support", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190216), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1903042 CSI ENHANCEMENT FOR MU-MIMO SUPPORT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96/Docs/R1%2D1903042%2Ezip, (20190216), XP051600738 [Y] 5-12 * section 6.1; pages 9-10 * | International search | [A]CN103141047 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [A]CN108352918 (ALCATEL LUCENT) [A] 1-30 * the wholed document *; | [A]US10200103 (RAHMAN MD SAIFUR [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the abstract, claims 1 and 19, line 56 of column 4 to line 31 of column 51 in the description * | by applicant | - "Discussion on Type II CSI compression", 3GPP Document R1-1813871 | - "Discussion on CSI enhancement for MU-MIMO", 3GPP Document R1-1810103 | - "CSI Enhancement for MU-MIMO Support", 3GPP Document R1-1903042 |