EP3930632 - CUSTOMIZED TIBIAL TRAYS, METHODS, AND SYSTEMS FOR KNEE REPLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | For all designated states Monogram Orthopaedics Inc. 3913 Todd Lane Austin, TX 78744 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | ||
For all designated states MONOGRAM ORTHOPAEDICS INC. 3913 Todd Lane Austin, TX 78744 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNIS, Douglas B. 53 Bridge Street Brooklyn, New York 11201 / US | 02 /
SCIFERT, Chris 3786 Russell Hurst Dr W Memphis, Tennessee 38135-1967 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
UNIS, Douglas B. Brooklyn, New York 11201 / US | ||
02 /
SCIFERT, Chris Memphis, Tennessee 38135-1967 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20763146.6 | 28.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US20279 | Priority number, date | US201962811855P | 28.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962811855 P | US201962879800P | 29.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879800 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020176824 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930632 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/28, A61B17/17, A61F2/38, // A61F2/30 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61B17/157 (US);
A61B17/1764 (EP);
A61B34/30 (US);
A61F2/38 (EP);
A61F2/3859 (EP);
A61F2/3877 (EP);
A61F2002/30131 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP);
A61F2002/30884 (EP);
A61F2002/30891 (EP);
A61F2002/30948 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30957 (EP);
A61F2002/30985 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3895 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | A61F2/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | ANGEPASSTE TIBIAPLATTEN, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR KNIEERSATZ | [2022/01] | English: | CUSTOMIZED TIBIAL TRAYS, METHODS, AND SYSTEMS FOR KNEE REPLACEMENT | [2022/01] | French: | PLATEAUX TIBIAUX PERSONNALISÉS, PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE REMPLACEMENT DU GENOU | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19705733 (PLUS ENDOPROTHETIK ENDOPLUS VE [DE]); | [X]US2010100191 (MAY BRIAN M [US], et al); | [XA]US8900316 (LENZ NATHANIEL M [US], et al); | [X]US9345578 (COLLAZO CARLOS E [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US5122144 (BERT JACK M [US], et al); | [X]US5486180 (DIETZ TERRY L [US], et al); | [XYA]US5683471 (INCAVO STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [XYA]US2005125068 (HOZACK WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]US2005267353 (MARQUART JOEL [US], et al); | [XA]US2006178749 (PENDLETON JOHN E [US], et al); | [A]US2008119939 (TERMANINI ZAFER [US]); | [XYA]US2010100191 (MAY BRIAN M [US], et al); | [A]US2018235762 (RADERMACHER KLAUS [DE], et al) |