EP3932491 - METHOD FOR SELECTING SUBJECT LIKELY BENEFITING FROM PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | For all designated states International Institute of Cancer Immunology, Inc. 13-9, Enoki-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0053 / JP | [2022/44] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | ||
For all designated states International Institute of Cancer Immunology, Inc. 13-9, Enoki-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0053 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAKAWA, Erina c/o Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kasugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0022 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Masashi Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2022/44] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
YAMAKAWA Erina Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0022 / JP | ||
02 /
GOTO Masashi Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0022 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20763424.7 | 27.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020JP08180 | Priority number, date | JP20190036458 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019036458 | [2022/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020175657 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932491 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C12N15/12, C12Q1/04, C12Q1/6886, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, G01N33/48, G01N33/49, G01N33/50, A61K39/00, C07K14/47 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (KR);
G01N33/57484 (US);
A61K38/00 (KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,KR);
A61K39/001151 (EP,KR);
A61K39/001153 (EP,KR);
C07K14/4748 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
G01N33/505 (EP);
G01N33/68 (KR);
A61K2039/572 (EP);
A61K2039/70 (EP);
C07K7/06 (KR);
C07K7/08 (KR);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,KR);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,KR);
C12Q2600/158 (EP);
G01N2800/52 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | A61P35/00, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C12N15/12, C12Q1/04, C12Q1/6851, C12Q1/686, C12Q1/6869, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, G01N33/48, G01N33/49, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL VON PATIENTEN, DIE WAHRSCHEINLICH VON EINER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON KREBS PROFITIEREN | [2022/01] | English: | METHOD FOR SELECTING SUBJECT LIKELY BENEFITING FROM PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING CANCER | [2022/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION DE SUJET SUSCEPTIBLE DE TIRER PROFIT D'UNE COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE PERMETTANT LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PRÉVENTION DU CANCER | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | Translation filed | 28.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 02.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014157692 (SUMITOMO DAINIPPON PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | by applicant | WO0006602 | WO0018795 | WO02079253 | WO03106682 | WO2004026897 | WO2005045027 | WO2007120673 | WO2009072610 | WO2014157692 |