EP3931621 - DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visteon Global Technologies, Inc. One Village Center Drive Van Buren Township, MI 48111 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINDORF, Paul Fredrick Luther c/o Visteon Global Technologies, Inc. One Village Center Drive Van Buren Township, Michigan 48111 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
WEINDORF, Paul Fredrick Luther Van Buren Township, Michigan 48111 / US | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20763941.0 | 24.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US19497 | Priority number, date | US201916284627 | 25.02.2019 Original published format: US201916284627 | US202062958010P | 07.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062958010 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020176411 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3931621 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G09G3/34, // G02B26/02, G02F1/13 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G09G3/3426 (EP);
G02F1/133606 (US);
G02B30/31 (EP);
G02F1/133536 (US);
G02F1/133603 (US);
G09G3/36 (EP);
G02F1/133601 (EP,US);
G02F1/133611 (US);
G02F1/13471 (EP);
G09G2300/023 (EP);
G09G2320/0209 (EP);
G09G2320/0238 (EP);
G09G2320/0271 (EP);
G09G2320/0276 (EP);
G09G2320/066 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | G02B26/02, G09G3/3225, G09G3/3233, G09G3/3258 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESYSTEM | [2022/01] | English: | DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2022/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009147186 (NAKAI NOBUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-15 * paragraphs [0353] - [0419]; figures 1-7,32-34,37,42,53 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]US2011279749 (ERINJIPPURATH GOPAL [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0038] - [0052] - [0063] - [0088] - [0100] , [0105] , [0112]; figures ,7B2A,4-5 *[I] 6; | [XI]US2018286325 (KOUDO TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0049] - [0050] - [0059] - [0074]; figures 1-6,8,9 * [I] 7,8 | International search | [A]US2005088401 (DALY SCOTT J [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US7916223 (KITAGAWA YOSHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 -20 * entire document *; | [A]US9860516 (SHIBAZAKI KIYOSHIGE [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US9864243 (ERINJIPPURATH GOPAL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US10056022 (BONNIER NICOLAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document * | by applicant | US2009147186 | US2011279749 | US2018286325 |