EP4017777 - AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM FOR A RAIL VEHICLE (HAVING AIR-TIGHT OR PRESSURE-TIGHT DUCTING IN THE AIR TREATMENT SECTION) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faiveley Transport Leipzig GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 60 04435 Schkeuditz / DE | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOECK, Lutz Wasserturmstr. 3b 04435 Schkeuditz / DE | 02 /
POSER, Steffen Schrebereck 3 04509 Krostitz / DE | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Erik Sommerfelder Straße 49 04451 Borsdorf / DE | 04 /
FISCHER, Kai An der Burgaue 1 04178 Leipzig / DE | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20763982.4 | 18.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020DE100718 | Priority number, date | DE201920104698U | 27.08.2019 Original published format: DE 202019104698 U | [2022/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021037309 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017777 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4017777 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B61D27/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
B61D27/0018 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
Y02T30/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE FÜR EIN SCHIENENFAHRZEUG (MIT LUFT- ODER DRUCKDICHTER KANALAUSBILDUNG IN DER LUFTBEHANDLUNGSSEKTION) | [2022/26] | English: | AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM FOR A RAIL VEHICLE (HAVING AIR-TIGHT OR PRESSURE-TIGHT DUCTING IN THE AIR TREATMENT SECTION) | [2022/26] | French: | INSTALLATION DE CLIMATISATION POUR UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE (À CONFIGURATION DE CONDUIT ÉTANCHE À L'AIR ET À LA PRESSION DANS LA PARTIE TRAITEMENT DE L'AIR) | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 22.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | LU | 18.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/28] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 |