EP4025138 - SURGICAL SYSTEM FOR OSTEOSYNTHESIS OF FEMORAL FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bispebjerg Hospital Bispebjerg Bakke 23 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTENSEN, Mikkel, Holm c/o BISPEBJERG HOSPITAL Bispebjerg Bakke 23 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 02 /
PALM, Henrik c/o BISPEBJERG HOSPITAL Bispebjerg Bakke 23 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 03 /
LAURITZEN, Jes, Bruun c/o BISPEBJERG HOSPITAL Bispebjerg Bakke 23 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/28] | 01 /
CHRISTENSEN, Mikkel, Holm c/o BISPEBJERG HOSPITAL Bispebjerg Bakke 23 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | ||
02 /
PALM, Henrik c/o BISPEBJERG HOSPITAL Bispebjerg Bakke 23 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | |||
03 /
LAURITZEN, Jes, Bruun c/o BISPEBJERG HOSPITAL Bispebjerg Bakke 23 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20764123.4 | 03.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP74607 | Priority number, date | EP20190195177 | 03.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19195177 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043907 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025138 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4025138 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/17, A61B17/74, A61B17/92 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
A61B17/1721 (EP,US);
A61B17/744 (EP,US);
A61B17/921 (EP);
A61B17/1725 (EP);
A61B2090/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES SYSTEM ZUR OSTEOSYNTHESE VON FEMURFRAKTUREN | [2022/28] | English: | SURGICAL SYSTEM FOR OSTEOSYNTHESIS OF FEMORAL FRACTURES | [2022/28] | French: | SYSTÈME CHIRURGICAL POUR L'OSTÉOSYNTHÈSE DE FRACTURES FÉMORALES | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/28] | SYSTÈME CHIRURGICAL POUR OSTÉOSYNTHÈSE DE FRACTURES FÉMORALES | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 21.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2647006 (ZIMMER SA [FR]); | [X]US5352228 (KUMMER FREDERICK J [US], et al); | [X]EP0976365 (OSTEO AG [CH]); | [X]US6120504 (BRUMBACK ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]DE202004014226U (MERETE MEDICAL GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP1839607 (DEPUY PRODUCTS INC [US]); | [XA]EP1867294 (ORTHODYNE INC [US], et al); | [X]US2008140077 (KEBAISH ADEL [US]); | [X]US2018116747 (MATITYAHU AMIR M [US], et al) | by applicant | US6221074 | US6562042 | EP1867294 | US7455673 |