EP4038253 - MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR HANDLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Straße 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTENSEN, Mario Vonscheidts Hof 43 45470 Mülheim / DE | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20764321.4 | 24.08.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020EP73599 | Priority number, date | DE201910135304 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019135304 | [2022/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021121685 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4038253 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E05B81/90, E05B81/76, E05B85/16 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
E05B81/90 (EP);
E05B81/77 (EP);
E05B85/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUG-TÜRGRIFFANORDNUNG | [2022/32] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR HANDLE ASSEMBLY | [2022/32] | French: | ENSEMBLE FORMANT POIGNÉE DE PORTIÈRE DE VÉHICULE MOTORISÉ | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 05.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1816290 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0025]; figures 1, 2, 3D * [I] 2; | [A]DE102014104217 (WITTE AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0021] - [0030]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE102018100654 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0016] , [ 0023] - [0027]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | DE102012103154 |