EP4022408 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ANALYZING A SEQUENTIAL PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wago Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Hansastrasse 27 32423 Minden / DE | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALKE, Nikolai Ulmenweg 18 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | 02 /
JENKE, Jan Ravensberger Straße 9 32457 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | 03 /
HOLM, Thomas Am Moorhof 22 31737 Rinteln / DE | 04 /
WOLTING, Calvin Darian Westenfeld 26 31604 Raddestorf / DE | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20764974.0 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020EP74138 | Priority number, date | DE201910213019 | 29.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019213019 | [2022/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021038079 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022408 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G05B19/4184 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32201 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANALYSIEREN EINES ABLAUFPROZESSES | [2022/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ANALYZING A SEQUENTIAL PROCESS | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR ANALYSER UN PROCESSUS DE DÉROULEMENT | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 14.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2014379301 (SHASTRI LOKENDRA [IN], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 27] - [0028] - [0 42] , [0 43]; figures 3, 4 *; | [A]US2018232338 (TASAKI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-19* paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0 56] - [0069]; figures 5,6 *; | [Y] - LU GUOLIANG ET AL, "A novel framework of change-point detection for machine monitoring", MECHANICAL SYSTEMS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160705), vol. 83, doi:10.1016/J.YMSSP.2016.06.030, ISSN 0888-3270, pages 533 - 548, XP029721745 [Y] 1-19 * 1 Introduction; 1.2 Contribution and organization of the paper; 2 Overview of proposed framework; 3 Periodicity estimation; 4 Change-point detection; 5.2 Results;; figures 1, 11-13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymssp.2016.06.030 |