EP4023028 - HANDLING OF SIDELINK RADIO LINK FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAGHEL, Sudhir Kumar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WU, Shuanshuan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SARKIS, Gabi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20765153.0 | 19.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020US46956 | Priority number, date | US201962893675P | 29.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962893675 P | US202016996078 | 18.08.2020 Original published format: US202016996078 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041106 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023028 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/23, H04W88/04 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04W76/23 (EP);
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W4/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG EINES SIDELINK-FUNKVERBINDUNGSAUSFALLS | [2022/27] | English: | HANDLING OF SIDELINK RADIO LINK FAILURE | [2022/27] | French: | GESTION DE DÉFAILLANCE DE LIAISON RADIO LATÉRALE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 31.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015172970 (DAI QIAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0093] *; | [XAI] - ERICSSON, "RLF handling in sidelink", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190815), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1910133- RLF HANDLING IN SIDELINK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107/Docs/R2-1910133.zip, (20190815), XP051767914 [X] 1,20 * paragraphs [0001] - [02.1] * [A] 7-19,24-30 [I] 2-6,21-23 | [XAI] - INTERDIGITAL INC, "RLM/RLF and RRM for NR V2X", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190215), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1901579 (R16 V2X SI A11421 RLM_RLF), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F105/Docs/R2%2D1901579%2Ezip, (20190215), XP051602934 [X] 7,24 * page 4 * [A] 1-6,20-23 [I] 8-19,25-30 | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Correction on V2X sidelink communication in TS 36.300", vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20181012 - 20181016, (20181209), 3GPP DRAFT; 36300_CR1199R2_(REL-15)_R2-1816470_CORRECTION ON V2X SIDELINK COMMUNICATION IN TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN/Docs/RP%2D182678%2Ezip, (20181209), XP051553727 [A] 1-30 * page 1 * | [A] - VIVO, "Open issues for Sidelink link failure and release", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190513), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1905845_OPEN ISSUES FOR SIDELINK LINK FAILURE AND RELEASE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN2/Docs/R2%2D1905845%2Ezip, (20190513), XP051729343 [A] 1-30 * pages 1-3 * |