EP3911885 - JOINT ROTATION STOP STRUCTURES FOR ARTICULATED SUPPORT ARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GCX Corporation 3875 Cypress Drive Petaluma, CA 94954-5635 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORLOZ, Paul Rene 3875 Cypress Drive Petaluma, California 94954-5635 / US | 02 /
LITTLEFIELD, Joshua Kawarii 3875 Cypress Drive Petaluma, California 94954-5635 / US | 03 /
GLASER, Robert Peter 3875 Cypress Drive Petaluma, California 94954-5635 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
BORLOZ, Paul Rene Petaluma, California 94954-5635 / US | ||
02 /
LITTLEFIELD, Joshua Kawarii Petaluma, California 94954-5635 / US | |||
03 /
GLASER, Robert Peter Petaluma, California 94954-5635 / US | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20765800.6 | 28.02.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US20467 | Priority number, date | US201962812893P | 01.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962812893 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020180717 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911885 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/08, F16M11/10, F16M11/20, F16M13/02 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
F16M11/041 (EP,CN);
F16M11/24 (EP,CN,US);
F16M11/2035 (CN,US);
A61B90/50 (CN,US);
F16M11/08 (CN,US);
F16M11/10 (CN,US);
F16M11/105 (EP,CN,US);
F16M11/20 (CN,US);
F16M11/2064 (EP,CN);
F16M11/2092 (EP,CN);
F16M13/02 (EP,CN,US);
E04B9/00 (US);
F16M2200/044 (EP,CN);
F16M2200/06 (CN,US);
F16M2200/063 (EP,CN);
F21V21/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | F16M11/20, F16M11/00, F16M11/04, F16M11/08, F16M11/10, F16M11/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | GELENKROTATIONSANSCHLAGSTRUKTUREN FÜR GELENKSTÜTZARME | [2021/47] | English: | JOINT ROTATION STOP STRUCTURES FOR ARTICULATED SUPPORT ARMS | [2021/47] | French: | STRUCTURES D'ARRÊT DE ROTATION D'ARTICULATION POUR LES BRAS SUPPORT ARTICULÉS | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5743503 (VOELLER DONALD M [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 37 - column 7, line 55; figures 1-6 * [I] 8-15; | [XI]US2005230585 (HUNG CHIN-JUI [TW]) [X] 1-6,8-12,14 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 21] , [0 22] , [0 23] , [0 28] , [0 31] , [0 35] , [0 36] , [0 37]; figures 1-8 * [I] 7,13,15; | [XI]US2014367137 (LEUNG SUK SIU [HK]) [X] 1-6,8-12,14 * paragraphs [0061] , [0 62] , [0 68] , [0 91]; figures 1, 7,8,12,13,16 *[I] 7,13,15 | International search | [Y]US4304385 (FAROUCHE PHILIP N, et al) [Y] 9, 15 * entire document *; | [A]US2001023914 (ODDSEN ODD N [US]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US2007089648 (HARRISON JOSEPH H [US], et al) [Y] 1-7, 9, 12 * entire document *; | [A]US2012235000 (BORLOZ PAUL RENE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2017314731 (GLASER ROBERT PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XY]US2018356031 (ZEBARJAD HAMID [CA], et al) [X] 11, 13, 14, 17, 18 * entire document * [Y] 1-7, 9, 12, 15 | by applicant | US5743503 | US2005230585 |