EP3936581 - FILM COATING COMPOSITION AND SOLID PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 2-30, Miyahara 5-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0003 / JP | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IZUI Wataru c/o SAWAI PHARMACEUTICAL Co., Ltd., 2-30, Miyahara 5-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka City, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMICHI Katsuki c/o SAWAI PHARMACEUTICAL Co., Ltd., 2-30, Miyahara 5-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka City, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | 03 /
MATSUKAWA Takuya c/o SAWAI PHARMACEUTICAL Co., Ltd., 2-30, Miyahara 5-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka City, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | 04 /
KIKUOKA Hiroaki c/o SAWAI PHARMACEUTICAL Co., Ltd., 2-30, Miyahara 5-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka City, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
IZUI Wataru Osaka City, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMICHI Katsuki Osaka City, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUKAWA Takuya Osaka City, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | |||
04 /
KIKUOKA Hiroaki Osaka City, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20766738.7 | 02.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020JP08709 | Priority number, date | JP20190038589 | 04.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019038589 | [2022/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020179736 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936581 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D129/04, A61K9/32, A61K45/00, A61K47/32, A61K47/34, A61K47/36, C09D7/43, C09D7/63, C09D7/65, C09D171/00 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/284 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (KR);
A61K9/2853 (US);
A61K45/00 (KR);
A61K47/32 (KR);
A61K47/34 (KR);
A61K47/36 (KR);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61K9/286 (US);
C09D129/04 (EP,KR);
C09D151/08 (EP);
C09D171/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C09D129/04, C08L71/02 (EP);
C09D151/08, C08L5/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | FILMBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FESTSTOFFZUBEREITUNG | [2022/02] | English: | FILM COATING COMPOSITION AND SOLID PREPARATION | [2022/02] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PELLICULAGE, ET PRÉPARATION PHARMACEUTIQUE SOLIDE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2021 | Translation filed | 06.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005107498 (KOLTER KARL [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * example 13 ** claim 9, *; | [X]EP2131823 (PF MEDICAMENT [FR]) [X] 1-3 * examples 3-5 * * claim 1 * | International search | [X]WO2018026596 (BPSI HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [X] 1-3* in particular, claims, page 1, lines 9-14, examples 8-11 *; | [X] - Maraie Nidhal K, Salman Zeina D, Yousif Nora Zawar, "Design and characterization of Oroslippery buoyant tablets for ranitidine hydrochloride", Asian Journal of Pharmaceutical and Clinical Research, (20180000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 143 - 149, XP055736982 [X] 1-3 * in particular, abstract, introduction , tables 2, 3, fig. 6, page 147, right column, line 8 to page 149, left column, line 2, conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.22159/ajpcr.2017.v11i1.21982 | [X] - MAHDI, ZAINAB H. et al., "New easily swallowed tablets with slippery coating for the antihypertensive drug valsartan", UK Journal of Pharmaceutical and Biosciences, (20150000), vol. 3, no. 5, ISSN 2347-9442, pages 9 - 19, XP055737932 [X] 1-3 * in particular, abstract, tables 2-4, 3.3 In-vivo slipperiness and taste masking effect of the prepared oroslippery tablets, fig. 1, 4, 4Conclusions * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.20510/ukjpb/3/i5/89481 | by applicant | JPS5426018B | WO2017057147 | WO2018026596 |