EP3813146 - PACKAGING HOUSING AND BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningde Amperex Technology Ltd. No.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 350900 / CN | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIA, Zhuocheng No.1 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 350900 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Kanzhu No.1 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 350900 / CN | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 20766914.4 | 28.02.2020 | [2021/17] | WO2020CN77289 | Priority number, date | CN201910160967 | 04.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910160967 | [2021/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020177641 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813146 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3813146 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/258, H01M50/264, H01M50/271 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (CN);
H01M10/04 (EP,US);
H01M10/4207 (US);
H01M10/6555 (CN);
H01M50/209 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/258 (EP);
H01M50/264 (EP);
H01M50/271 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAPSELUNGSGEHÄUSE UND BATTERIEPACK | [2021/17] | English: | PACKAGING HOUSING AND BATTERY PACK | [2021/17] | French: | BOÎTIER DE CONDITIONNEMENT ET BLOC-BATTERIE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2021 | Translation filed | 22.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 04.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20170056306 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,15 * figures 11,12 *; | [A]US2017214012 (BENEDICT SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 2,5 *; | [XA]EP3285311 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,15 * figure 2 * [A] 5-14; | [A]WO2018042763 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2018138473 (BESSHO TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 11 *; | [A]WO2019039139 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]CN206639822U (SHENZHEN OPTIMUM BATTERY CO) [X] 1-5, 12 * description, paragraphs 0024-0035, and figure 1 *; | [A]CN206806385U (DISIDA NEW ENERGY SHANGHAI CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018034471 (MPS KOREA CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [A]CN107732063 (JIANGSU YINJI ENCARBON ENERGY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN207743294U (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN207818694U (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document * |