EP3936478 - ACTIVATED CARBON AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHITA, Mitsunori c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 4342, Tsurumi Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | 02 /
HITOMI, Mitsunori c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 4342, Tsurumi Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Takayuki c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 4342, Tsurumi Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
NISHITA, Mitsunori Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | ||
02 /
HITOMI, Mitsunori Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMADA, Takayuki Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20767364.1 | 02.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020JP08740 | Priority number, date | JP20190040787 | 06.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019040787 | [2022/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020179745 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936478 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/318, B01J20/20, B01J20/28, B01J20/30 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
F02M25/0854 (EP,KR);
C01B32/318 (EP,KR);
C01B32/324 (US);
B01J20/20 (EP,KR);
B01J20/28 (KR);
B01J20/28066 (EP);
B01J20/28071 (EP);
B01J20/2808 (EP);
B01J20/28092 (EP);
B01J20/30 (KR,US);
B01J20/3007 (EP);
B01J20/3071 (EP);
B01J20/3078 (EP);
B01J20/3085 (EP);
C01B32/342 (US);
C01B32/384 (US);
B01J2220/4825 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | AKTIVIERTER KOHLENSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/02] | English: | ACTIVATED CARBON AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2022/02] | French: | CHARBON ACTIF, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | Translation filed | 26.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 02.02.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH11349320 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] - [0019]; claims 1-3; table 1 * [I] 9; | [X]JP2000313611 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0036]; example 1; table 1 *; | [XA]JP2001240407 (KURARAY CHEMICAL KK) [X] 1 * figure 2; example 9; table 2 * [A] 7-9; | [A]JP2017135154 (JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORP) [A] 1-9* figure 1; examples 1-comp.3; claims 1-7; table 1 * | International search | [A]JPH069208 (WESTVACO CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [X]JPH11349320 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0021] *; | [X]JP2000313611 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0014], [0017]-[0022], [0026]-[00333] *; | [A]JP2001240407 (KURARAY CHEMICAL KK) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]WO2004110928 (KURARAY CHEMICAL KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2005021750 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-9* , entire text *; | [A]JP2006213544 (KURARAY CHEMICAL KK) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2013530114 (SGL CARBON SE) [A] 1-9 * , entire text * | by applicant | JPH02167809 | JPH0656416 | WO2018021246 |