EP4028189 - TOOL BLADE ADJUSTMENT HEAD AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME AND FOR CORRECTING THE TOOL BLADE WEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blum-Novotest GmbH Kaufstrasse 14 88287 Grünkraut / DE | For all designated states CERATIZIT Besigheim GmbH Zeppelinstraße 3 74354 Besigheim / DE | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Blum-Novotest GmbH Kaufstrasse 14 88287 Grünkraut-Gullen / DE | ||
For all designated states KOMET Deutschland GmbH Zeppelinstraße 3 74354 Besigheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Gregor Hermann-Loens-Weg 9 88284 Wolpertswende / DE | 02 /
HARSCHER, Christian Ahornweg 29 88410 Bad Wurzach-Seibranz / DE | 03 /
VUJICA, Thomas Am Schlehenhang 9 88255 Baienfurt / DE | 04 /
RENZ, Michael c/o KOMET Deutschland GmbH Zeppelinstr. 3 74354 Besigheim / DE | 05 /
BOOS, Martin Taunusweg 5 88281 Schlier / DE | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20767741.0 | 01.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020EP74261 | Priority number, date | DE20191006466 | 11.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019006466 | [2022/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021047940 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028189 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/034, B23Q1/00, B23Q17/20 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
B23B29/03492 (EP,US);
B23B29/03432 (EP);
B23Q1/0009 (EP,US);
B23Q17/20 (EP,US);
B23B2260/128 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33207 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGSCHNEIDEN-VERSTELLKOPF, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB UND ZUR KORREKTUR DES WERKZEUGSCHNEIDEN-VERSCHLEIßES | [2022/29] | English: | TOOL BLADE ADJUSTMENT HEAD AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME AND FOR CORRECTING THE TOOL BLADE WEAR | [2022/29] | French: | TÊTE DE RÉGLAGE DE LAME D'OUTIL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ET DE CORRECTION DE L'USURE DE LA LAME D'OUTIL | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO8803672 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]); | [X]EP0753367 (KOMET STAHLHALTER WERKZEUG [DE]); | [A]DE102013217911 (KOMET GROUP GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE10262188 | DE2010200 | DE3526712 | EP0491724 | EP0719195 | EP0907444 | DE102013008182 |