EP4018050 - CURTAIN WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Claeys, Stephanie Catharina R. Theo De Belderlaan 4 2240 Zandhoven / BE | For all designated states Claeys, Laurens Leonard J. Theo De Belderlaan 4 2240 Zandhoven / BE | For all designated states Claeys, Nausikaä Els P. Theo De Belderlaan 4 2240 Zandhoven / BE | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAEYS, Eric Theo De Belderlaan 4 2240 Zandhoven / BE | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | IPLodge bv Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20767977.0 | 20.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020EP73405 | Priority number, date | US201962889141P | 20.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962889141 P | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021032854 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018050 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/96 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
E04B2/965 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VORHANGFASSADE | [2022/26] | English: | CURTAIN WALL | [2022/26] | French: | MUR-RIDEAU | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 17.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4537000 (GARTNER KARL [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 48; figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 6 - line 8 *; | [XY]EP0658662 (WERNER GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 36; figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 2 - line 12 * [Y] 12; | [Y]WO2010122593 (LILLI SYSTEMS S R L [IT], et al) [Y] 12* figure 2; claim 8 * | by applicant | US3266210 | KR20130075240 | WO2017201588 | WO2017201587 | WO2017201589 |