EP4031828 - TARGET LAUNCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laporte Holding 371 Chemin des Prés 06410 Biot / FR | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPORTE, Jean-Michel 371 Chemin des Prés 06410 BIOT / FR | 02 /
FOUQUES, Jean-Marc Les Jardins de Pamplemousse 360 Chemin de la Parouquine 06600 ANTIBES / FR | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [2023/30] |
Former [2022/30] | Decobert, Jean-Pascal Cabinet Hautier Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 20768072.9 | 14.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020EP75648 | Priority number, date | FR20190010253 | 17.09.2019 Original published format: FR 1910253 | [2022/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052910 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031828 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4031828 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F41J9/18 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
F41J9/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIELABSCHUSSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/30] | English: | TARGET LAUNCHING DEVICE | [2022/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LANCEMENT DE CIBLES | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 23.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 14.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 14.09.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9618864 (LAPORTE BALL TRAP SARL [FR], et al) [A] 1,11 * page 4, line 35 - line 37; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2965611 (GAY GUY [FR]) [A] 1,11 * page 6, line 18 - page 8, line 25; figures 1a-7; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2019077110 (LAPORTE HOLDING [FR]) [A] 1,11* figure 1; claim 1 * |