EP4022070 - CONTROLLED EXPRESSION OF VIRAL PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLACK, Jeffrey Morley c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
HENDRICKS, Andrade c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 03 /
SLADE, Peter c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 04 /
NGUYEN, Christopher c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20768210.5 | 26.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020US47910 | Priority number, date | US201962891621P | 26.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962891621 P | US202062981796P | 26.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062981796 P | US202063017776P | 30.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063017776 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041485 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022070 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/72, C12N15/87 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
C12N15/72 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C07K14/195 (US);
C12N2710/14044 (EP);
C12N2750/14123 (EP);
C12N2750/14141 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (US);
C12N2750/14151 (EP);
C12N2750/14152 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | KONTROLLIERTE EXPRESSION VIRALER PROTEINE | [2022/27] | English: | CONTROLLED EXPRESSION OF VIRAL PROTEINS | [2022/27] | French: | EXPRESSION CONTRÔLÉE DE PROTÉINES VIRALES | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 25.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 19.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2016019364 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]); | by applicant | US246447 | US465302 | US790611 | US5064764 | US5387484 | WO9617947 | WO9639530 | US5688676 | US5691176 | WO9810088 | EP0835321 | US5741683 | US5756283 | WO9914354 | WO9915685 | EP0931158 | WO9947691 | EP0950111 | WO0024916 | WO0028004 | EP1015619 | WO0047757 | WO0055342 | US6133027 | US6143567 | US6143548 | US6146874 | US6156303 | WO0075353 | EP1064393 | US6180613 | US6194191 | US6204059 | WO0123001 | WO0123597 | US6258595 | US6261551 | US6270996 | US6274354 | US6281010 | EP1163354 | US2002019050 | WO0212455 | EP1183380 | US6365394 | US6410300 | US2002081721 | US2002090717 | EP1226264 | US2002102714 | US6428988 | US6436394 | US6475769 | US6482634 | US6485966 | US6503888 | US2003032613 | US2003040101 | US2003073232 | US2003092161 | US6566118 | US2003119191 | US6593123 | US2003138772 | US6660521 | US6660514 | US6676935 | US6699706 | US6726907 | WO2004112727 | WO2005005610 | WO2005072364 | US6943019 | US6953690 | US2006003451 | US6995006 | US7015026 | EP1636370 | US7022519 | US7048920 | US7091030 | US7094604 | US2006211115 | US7125706 | US2007004042 | WO2007046703 | US7223585 | US7238526 | US2007231303 | US7291498 | US7300797 | WO2007148971 | US7326555 | US7419956 | US7419817 | US7445930 | EP2018421 | US7491508 | US7510875 | US7579181 | US2009275107 | US7625570 | US7704721 | US7732129 | US7888096 | US7901921 | US2011136227 | US2011151434 | US7968333 | US2011171262 | US2011229971 | US2011263027 | US8110351 | US8137948 | US8163543 | US8236495 | US8283151 | US2012264807 | US2013023034 | US2013045186 | US8462014 | US8476418 | US2013195801 | US8512981 | US8524446 | US2013323302 | US8614101 | US8642314 | US2014087361 | US8685734 | US2014099666 | US8697417 | WO2015038958 | WO2015191508 | US2016032254 | WO2016073693 | WO2016077687 | WO2016077689 | WO2016094783 | WO2016134375 | WO2016137949 | US9475845 | US2016369298 | WO2017015102 | WO2017023724 | WO2017058892 | US9624274 | WO2017066764 | WO2017075335 | WO2017083722 | US9659203 | US2017145405 | WO2017100671 | WO2017189963 | WO2017189959 | WO2017189964 | WO2017201258 | WO2017201248 | US2018258424 | WO2018204786 | WO2018204803 | WO2018204797 | WO2018232055 | US19550627418 | US19950549489 | WO1996US10245 | WO1997US15716 | WO1997US15691 | WO1998US19479 | WO1998US19463 | WO1999US05870 | WO2000US00415 | WO2000US04755 | WO2000US40872 | WO2004US16614 | WO2007US10055 | WO2019US54600 |