EP4031856 - A DEVICE, A METHOD, A SYSTEM AND A KIT FOR MEASURING AN AMOUNT OF DIRT BY MEASUREMENT OF ELECTRICAL RESISTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/30] | A DEVICE, A METHOD, A SYSTEM AND A KIT FOR MEASURING AN AMOUNT OF DIRT BY MEASUREMENT OF ELECTRICAL RESISTIVITY | ||
[2023/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rehninvent AB Libaugatan 5 252 70 RÅÅ / SE | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REHNSTRÖM, Johan Henrik 109 Princess Victoria Street BRISTOL BS8 4DD / GB | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20768322.8 | 04.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020EP74818 | Priority number, date | SE20190051065 | 20.09.2019 Original published format: SE 1951065 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052784 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031856 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4031856 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/16, G01N1/02, G01N27/04, G01N15/06, B08B13/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
G01N27/043 (EP,KR,US);
G01N27/00 (SE);
G01N27/041 (CN);
A47L13/16 (EP,KR,SE);
B08B13/00 (EP,KR);
G01N1/02 (EP,KR,US);
G01N15/0606 (EP);
G01N15/0656 (EP);
G01N33/00 (SE);
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | G01N27/04, B08B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND KIT ZUM MESSEN EINER MENGE VON SCHMUTZ DURCH MESSUNG DES ELEKTRISCHEN WIDERSTANDES | [2022/30] | English: | A DEVICE, A METHOD, A SYSTEM AND A KIT FOR MEASURING AN AMOUNT OF DIRT BY MEASUREMENT OF ELECTRICAL RESISTIVITY | [2023/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET NÉCESSAIRE POUR MESURER UNE QUANTITÉ DE SALETÉ PAR MESURE DE RÉSISTIVITÉ ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/30] | A DEVICE, A METHOD, A SYSTEM AND A KIT FOR MEASURING AN AMOUNT OF DIRT BY MEASUREMENT OF ELECTRICAL RESISTIVITY | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 08.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013180271 (KUCZYNSKI JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2019011530 (SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY AS [DK]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |