EP4034696 - COMPOSITION FOR COPPER BUMP ELECTRODEPOSITION COMPRISING A LEVELING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGELHARDT, Nadine Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
FLUEGEL, Alexander Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
ARNOLD, Marco Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
EMNET, Charlotte Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20768371.5 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020EP75761 | Priority number, date | EP20190200126 | 27.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19200126 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058334 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034696 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/38, C25D7/12 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
C25D3/38 (EP,CN,KR);
C25D1/00 (US);
C25D7/123 (EP,CN,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ELEKTROLYTISCHEN COPPER-BUMP-ABSCHEIDUNG MIT EINEM VERLAUFSMITTEL | [2022/31] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR COPPER BUMP ELECTRODEPOSITION COMPRISING A LEVELING AGENT | [2022/31] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR L'ÉLECTRODÉPOSITION DE BOSSE DE CUIVRE COMPRENANT UN AGENT DE NIVELLEMENT | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 28.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4036711 (KARDOS OTTO, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 9 - columns 30-57 *; | [XI]WO2010115757 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,13-15 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 41 * * page 18, line 10 - page 20, line 16 * [I] 5-12; | [A]US2012027948 (ROEGER-GOEPFERT CORNELIA [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0034] *; | [A]EP2547731 (BASF SE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0025] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0045] * * paragraphs [0108] - [0114] *; | [A]US2014238868 (LI TINA C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0024] * * paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2015060132 (MURAKAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0201] - [0211] * | by applicant | US2182306 | US2208095 | US2553696 | US2806839 | US3033746 | WO2010069810 | WO2010115796 | WO2010115756 | WO2010115757 | WO2010115717 | WO2011012462 | WO2011012475 | WO2011064154 | WO2011151785 | WO2012085811 | WO2014072885 | WO2016020216 | WO2018073011 | WO2018114985 | WO2018219848 | - "Polyoxyalkylenes", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry |