EP3861748 - UNIFIED BLOCK VECTOR PREDICTION FOR INTRA PICTURE BLOCK COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Xiaozhong c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
LI, Xiang c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shan c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/32] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20769964.6 | 06.03.2020 | [2021/32] | WO2020US21505 | Priority number, date | US201962816051P | 08.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962816051 P | US201916531827 | 05.08.2019 Original published format: US201916531827 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185602 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861748 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/56, H04N19/137, H04N19/139, H04N19/44, H04N19/513, H04N19/50, H04N19/159, H04N19/176, H04N19/18 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H04N19/593 (EP,KR);
H04N19/159 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/56 (CN);
H04N19/105 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/11 (KR);
H04N19/137 (CN);
H04N19/139 (CN);
H04N19/176 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/18 (CN);
H04N19/44 (CN,KR,US);
H04N19/50 (CN);
H04N19/513 (CN);
H04N19/70 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | VEREINHEITLICHTE BLOCKVEKTORVORHERSAGE ZUR BILDINTERNEN BLOCKKOMPENSATION | [2021/32] | English: | UNIFIED BLOCK VECTOR PREDICTION FOR INTRA PICTURE BLOCK COMPENSATION | [2021/32] | French: | PRÉDICTION DE VECTEUR DE BLOC UNIFIÉ POUR LA COMPENSATION DE BLOC INTRA-IMAGE | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016100189 (PANG CHAO [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2015365666 (DONG JIE [US], et al); | [A]WO2016051362 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al); | [A]US2016227214 (RAPAKA KRISHNAKANTH [US], et al); | [A]US2016330471 (ZHU LIHUA [US], et al); | [A]US2017155914 (JEON BYEUNG WOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2017302966 (XU XIAOZHONG [US], et al) |