EP3915997 - TRANSITION METAL COMPOUND AND CATALYST COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Byung Seok LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Insun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Seok Hwan LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jung Won LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
GWON, Donghyeon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
JEON, Sangjin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Seyoung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 08 /
PARK, Heekwang LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/47] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
KIM, Byung Seok Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Insun Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Seok Hwan Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Jung Won Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
05 /
GWON, Donghyeon Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
06 /
JEON, Sangjin Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Seyoung Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
08 /
PARK, Heekwang Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20770661.5 | 04.03.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020KR03044 | Priority number, date | KR20190028867 | 13.03.2019 Original published format: KR 20190028867 | [2021/48] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020184887 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915997 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3915997 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F4/6592, C08F4/659, C08F4/52, C08F2/38, C08F110/06, D01F6/06 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,KR);
C08F4/65927 (KR,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/38 (KR,US);
C08F4/52 (KR);
C08F4/65912 (KR,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2500/12 (KR);
D01F6/06 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/06, C08F2/02 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F4/65927 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | C07F17/00, C08F4/6592, C08F4/659, C08F4/52, C08F2/38, C08F110/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERGANGSMETALLVERBINDUNG UND KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2021/48] | English: | TRANSITION METAL COMPOUND AND CATALYST COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME | [2021/48] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE MÉTAL DE TRANSITION ET COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR LE COMPRENANT | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2021 | Translation filed | 23.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 04.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005058916 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 1-7 * * abstract * * compound (I) * * claims 1-11 *; | [Y]WO2014099303 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 13, line 15 - line 22 * * abstract *; | [Y]WO2017069854 (EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 13, line 5 - line 12 ** abstract *; | [E]WO2021034459 (EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * claims 1-67 *; | [E]EP3936542 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1-15 * claims 1-11 * | International search | [A]EP1077215 (SOLVAY [BE]) [A] 1-16; | [X]WO2014099303 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-16; | [A]WO2017060691 (SCG CHEMICALS CO LTD [TH]) [A] 1-16; | [X]WO2017069854 (EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-6; | [A]US2018201630 (YANG JIAN [US], et al)[A] 1-16 |