EP4003990 - PYRAZOLE COMPOUNDS, FORMULATIONS THEREOF, AND A METHOD FOR USING THE COMPOUNDS AND/OR FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Lu c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
DUAN, Matt c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
DARWISH, Ihab c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
SHAW, Simon c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 05 /
BHAMIDIPATI, Somasekhar c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 06 /
TAYLOR, Vanessa c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Yan c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 08 /
FAN, Dazhong c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 09 /
LUO, Zhushou c/o Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Engstle, Verena Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20771685.3 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US48528 | Priority number, date | US201962894547P | 30.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962894547 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041898 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003990 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, C07C59/255, A61P29/00, A61K31/4439 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (KR);
A61K9/1623 (KR);
A61K9/1635 (KR);
A61K9/1652 (KR);
A61P11/00 (CN);
A61P25/00 (CN);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61P31/04 (CN);
A61P31/12 (CN);
A61P37/02 (CN);
A61P37/08 (CN);
A61P43/00 (CN);
A61P7/00 (CN);
A61P7/06 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | PYRAZOLVERBINDUNGEN, DEREN FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DER VERBINDUNGEN UND/ODER FORMULIERUNGEN | [2022/22] | English: | PYRAZOLE COMPOUNDS, FORMULATIONS THEREOF, AND A METHOD FOR USING THE COMPOUNDS AND/OR FORMULATIONS | [2022/22] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PYRAZOLE, FORMULATIONS DE CEUX-CI, ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DES COMPOSÉS ET/OU DES FORMULATIONS | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 23.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2016172560 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [I] 1-25* page 1, line 14 - line 19; claims 1,28,29,40; compounds II-176 * | by applicant | US4738851 | US4882150 | US4921475 | US5008110 | US5077033 | US5087240 | US5088977 | US5164189 | US5163899 | US5254346 | US5290561 | US5332213 | US5336168 | US5352456 | US5403841 | US5407713 | US5521222 | US5698219 | US5776445 | US5800807 | US6056950 | US6197934 | US6261547 | - S. M. BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - T. HIGUCHIV. STELLA, "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", A.C.S. Symposium Series, vol. 14 | - TUMAS et al., J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (20010000), vol. 107, no. 6, pages 1025 - 1033 | - "General Principles", FINGLWOODBURY, Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics, Pergamon Press, pages 1 - 46 | - FOSTER, Allergy, (19950000), vol. 50, no. 21, pages 6 - 9 | - SZELENYI et al., Arzneimittelforschung, (20000000), vol. 50, no. 11, pages 1037 - 42 | - KAWAGUCHI et al., Clin. Exp. Allergy, (19940000), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 238 - 244 | - SUGIMOTO et al., Immunopharmacology, (20000000), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 1 - 7 |