EP4031481 - DISPENSING VALVE WITH LOCKING CONTROL LEVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/30] | NOZZLE HAVING A LOCKABLE CONTROL LEVER | ||
[2023/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELAFLEX HIBY GmbH & Co. KG Schnackenburgallee 121 22525 Hamburg / DE | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Ulrich Lachmannweg 7 22589 Hamburg / DE | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20772288.5 | 16.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020EP75791 | Priority number, date | EP20190197972 | 18.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19197972 | [2022/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052975 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031481 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4031481 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B67D7/42, B67D7/50 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
B67D7/42 (EP,CN);
B67D7/50 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAPFVENTIL MIT ARRETIERBAREM STEUERHEBEL | [2022/30] | English: | DISPENSING VALVE WITH LOCKING CONTROL LEVER | [2023/18] | French: | SOUPAPE DE SOUTIRAGE POURVUE DE LEVIER DE COMMANDE POUVANT ÊTRE BLOQUÉ | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/30] | NOZZLE HAVING A LOCKABLE CONTROL LEVER | ||
Former [2022/30] | PISTOLET DISTRIBUEUR DOTÉ D'UN LEVIER DE COMMANDE BLOCABLE | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 14.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | IE | 16.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
IE | 16.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2134882 (LJUNGMANS VERKSTADER AB) [A] 1* page 1, line 43 - line 113; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0286353 (AEROQUIP AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 6 - line 20 * * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 26; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2016347602 (CLEVER BRYAN WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0057]; figures 2-9 * | Examination | EP0286353 | by applicant | DE60303279T | US2016347602 |