EP3943766 - ELECTRIC ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Shintarou c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Takahide c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Shintarou Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Takahide Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20772554.0 | 26.02.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020JP07744 | Priority number, date | JP20190049763 | 18.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019049763 | JP20190059054 | 26.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019059054 | [2022/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020189200 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943766 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/06, F16C19/46, F16C19/54, F16H1/10, F16H1/32, H02K7/116, F16H57/021, F01L1/356 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
F01L1/352 (EP,US);
F01L1/344 (EP,US);
F01L1/022 (EP);
F01L1/047 (US);
F01L1/356 (EP);
F16C19/54 (EP,US);
F16H1/32 (EP);
F16H57/021 (EP,US);
H02K21/16 (EP,US);
H02K7/083 (US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
F01L2013/111 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER AKTUATOR | [2022/04] | English: | ELECTRIC ACTUATOR | [2022/04] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2021 | Translation filed | 07.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 30.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2012197755 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD); | [A]US2014076253 (KOKUBO NAOKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015075475 (KAWADA SHINICHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP3179063 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) | International search | [A]JP2016211443 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD); | [A]JP2018194151 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2014152766 |