EP3943621 - BASE MATERIAL FOR CLAD STEEL, CLAD STEEL, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CLAD STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Steel Works M&E, Inc. 4, Chatsucho Muroran-shi Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Takashi c/o Japan Steel Works M&E, Inc. 4, Chatsucho Muroran-shi Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMOTO, Kenta c/o Japan Steel Works M&E, Inc. 4, Chatsucho Muroran-shi Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Daishiro c/o Japan Steel Works M&E, Inc. 4, Chatsucho Muroran-shi Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | 04 /
HASHI, Kunihiko c/o Japan Steel Works M&E, Inc. 4, Chatsucho Muroran-shi Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | [2022/26] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Takashi Muroran-shi, Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIMOTO, Kenta Muroran-shi, Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | |||
03 /
SUZUKI, Daishiro Muroran-shi, Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | |||
04 /
HASHI, Kunihiko Muroran-shi, Hokkaido 051-8505 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20772572.2 | 17.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020JP11681 | Priority number, date | JP20190049681 | 18.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019049681 | [2022/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020189672 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943621 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/00, C22C38/00, C22C38/58, C21D1/18, C21D8/02, C21D9/46, C22C38/04, C22C38/12, C22C38/14 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
C21D1/18 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D8/0221 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | C21D9/00, C22C38/00, C22C38/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | BASISMATERIAL FÜR PLATTIERTEN STAHL, PLATTIERTER STAHL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLATTIERTEM STAHL | [2022/04] | English: | BASE MATERIAL FOR CLAD STEEL, CLAD STEEL, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CLAD STEEL | [2022/04] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE BASE DESTINÉ À DE L'ACIER PLAQUÉ, ACIER PLAQUÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ACIER PLAQUÉ | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2021 | Translation filed | 16.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 04.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6043433 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [Y] 1-5 * abstract ** tables 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1416059 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0010] - [0038] - [0041] - [0058] * * tables 1,2 * * figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]JP2004149821 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2009185368 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [A] 1-5; | [A]KR20130053706 (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND [KR])[A] 1-5; | [A]US2016052080 (CHAKRAVARTI BHAVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2016108665 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2019007056 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 | by applicant | JP2015224376 | JP2019049681 |