EP3923399 - BATTERY PACK AND COOLING SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2021/50] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Yanlong No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
BAI, Xueyu No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
GU, Yanlong Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
BAI, Xueyu Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Neumarkterstr. 21 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20772699.3 | 28.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020CN77273 | Priority number, date | CN201920344391U | 18.03.2019 Original published format: CN 201920344391 U | [2021/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020187005 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923399 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/613, H01M10/6556, H01M10/6568, F28D1/053 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,US);
F28D1/05366 (EP);
F28F9/16 (EP,US);
H01M10/6568 (US);
H01M50/204 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | H01M10/613, H01M10/6556, H01M10/6568 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | BATTERIESATZ UND KÜHLSYSTEM DAFÜR | [2021/50] | English: | BATTERY PACK AND COOLING SYSTEM THEREOF | [2021/50] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE ET SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2021 | Translation filed | 10.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 01.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0714008 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]CN1162108 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-11,13,15 * abstract *; | [X]WO2018020139 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 1-7,9-11,13,15 * page 4, line 27 - page 8, line 18; figures 1-5 * | International search | [X]US5246066 (MORGAN JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1-18, * description, column 1, lines 5-68, column 2, line 17 to column 4, line 30, and figures 1-8 *; | [X]CN1162108 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1-18 * description, page 2, line 14 to page 7, line 7, and figures 1-8 *; | [X]KR20060038190 (HALLA CLIMATE CONTROL CORP [KR]) [X] 1-18 * description, page 3, paragraph 14 to page 5, paragraph 14, and figures 1-4 and 5a-5g *; | [X]US2016282062 (GIRMSCHEID FELIX [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 1-7 and 47-69, and figures 2a, 2b, and 3 *; | [A]CN205646066U (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [X]WO2018020139 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 1-18 * description, page 4, line 4 to page 9, line 13, and figures 1-5 *; | [PX]CN209357871U (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-18 * entire document *; | [PX]WO2019229355 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [PX] 1-18, * entire document * |