EP3859608 - NARROW-STRIP TWO-DIMENSIONAL BARCODE, AND METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING AND RECOGNIZING NARROW-STRIP TWO-DIMENSIONAL BARCODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TU, Yinhai Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3, No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yuhang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 20773181.1 | 07.01.2020 | [2021/31] | WO2020CN70641 | Priority number, date | CN201910205310 | 18.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910205310 | [2021/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020186900 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3859608 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, G06K7/14 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G06K7/1417 (EP,CN,US);
G06K19/06037 (EP,CN,US);
G06K19/06046 (CN);
G06K7/1443 (CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | G06K19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | ZWEIDIMENSIONALER STRICHCODE MIT SCHMALEM STREIFEN, VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND GERÄT ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND ERKENNUNG EINES ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN STRICHCODES MIT SCHMALEM STREIFEN | [2021/31] | English: | NARROW-STRIP TWO-DIMENSIONAL BARCODE, AND METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING AND RECOGNIZING NARROW-STRIP TWO-DIMENSIONAL BARCODE | [2021/31] | French: | CODE À BARRES BIDIMENSIONNEL À BANDE ÉTROITE, ET PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF POUR GÉNÉRER ET RECONNAÎTRE UN CODE À BARRES BIDIMENSIONNEL À BANDE ÉTROITE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2021 | Translation filed | 26.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5686718 (IWAI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9,11-14 * figure 1 * * column 19, line 44 - column 20, line 11 * * figure 7 * * column 21, lines 51-59 * * figures 21-33 * * column 28, line 1 - column 33, line 31 * [I] 6-8,10,15; | [XI]US9892300 (HOSOKANE YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 11,12,14 * figure 11c * * column 21, lines 43-54 * [I] 1-5,13,15; | [XP]EP3467715 (DENSO WAVE INC [JP]) [XP] 5,11 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] * * figure 3 ** paragraphs [0038] - [0047] * | International search | [A]JP2000276564 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [Y]CN108875874 (HEFEI LANGJIN FALSE PROOF TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-26 * description, paragraphs [0018]-[0027], and figure 1 *; | [A]CN108960000 (SHENZHEN 0 0 TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [Y]CN109325381 (JOINT RES INST, et al) [Y] 1-26 * description, paragraphs [0038]-[0082], and figures 1-3 *; | [PX]CN109657513 (DENSO WAVE INC) [PX] 1-26 * entire document *; | [PX]CN110033065 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD) [PX] 1-26 * entire document * |