EP4094458 - SIDELINK BEAM REPORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIA, Pengfei 5798 Blazing Star Ln San Diego, California 92130 / US | 02 /
LIU, Bin 13559 Peach Tree Way San Diego, California 92130 / US | 03 /
KWON, Young Hoon 27435 Country Lane Rd Laguna Nigue, California 92677 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 20774085.3 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020US22414 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020190646 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094458 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/40, H04W24/10, H04W72/14, H04W92/18, H04W76/14, H04B7/06, H04W74/08 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H04W74/002 (EP);
H04B7/0632 (EP,US);
H04B7/0639 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H04W4/40, H04W24/10, H04W72/14, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | SIDELINK-STRAHLMELDUNG | [2022/48] | English: | SIDELINK BEAM REPORTING | [2022/48] | French: | RAPPORT DE FAISCEAU DE LIAISON LATÉRALE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018049177 (ISLAM MUHAMMAD NAZMUL [US], et al) [A] 1-7,13* figure 2 *; | [IY]US2018343595 (DA SILVA ICARO L J [SE], et al) [I] 1-7,13 * paragraphs [0078] - [0110] * * figure 3 * [Y] 4,5; | [A]US2018368126 (ISLAM MUHAMMAD NAZMUL [US], et al) [A] 1-7,13 * paragraphs [0121] - [0129] * * figure 10 *; | [IY]WO2019174532 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,6,7,13 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 83] , [0 84] , [0 95] , [0 96] , [0 98] * * figures 18, 21 * [Y] 5; | [IAY]WO2020033795 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [I] 1-3,7,13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 80] , [ 175] - [0177] * [A] 6 [Y] 4,5 | International search | [A]US2019045569 (ABEDINI NAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 8-11, 15-18 * entire document *; | [Y]US2019306924 (ZHANG YUSHU [CN], et al) [Y] 39, 42, 45 * entire document *; | [XA]US2019364590 (SARTORI PHILIPPE [US], et al) [X] 22, 23, 27, 28, 32, 33 * entire document * [A] 1-4, 8-11, 15-18; | [XYA]US2020022089 (GUO LI [US]) [X] 37, 38, 40, 41, 43, 44 * entire document * [Y] 39, 42, 45 [A] 1-4, 8-11, 15-18; | [A]US2020029340 (HE CHAO [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 8-11, 15-18, 22-24, 27-29, 32-34, 37-45* entire document *; | [A]US2020045664 (CHOI SU HAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-4, 8-11, 15-18, 22-24, 27-29, 32-34, 37-45 * entire document *; | [A]WO2020047024 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4, 8-11, 15-18, 22-24, 27-29, 32-34, 37-45 * entire document * | by applicant | US2018343595 | WO2019174532 | WO2020033795 |