EP3941460 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING INSULIN SENSITIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nieman, Lynnette K. Building 10/CRC, Room 1-3140, 10 Center Drive Bethesda, MD 20892 / US | For all designated states Ulmann, André 23 rue Pascal 75005 Paris / FR | For all designated states Newman, Arnold L. P.O. Box 171 Cabin John, MD 20818 / US | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20774479.8 | 09.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020US00009 | Priority number, date | US201962919496P | 18.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962919496 P | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020190351 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941460 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/567, A61K31/4745, A61K31/513, A61K31/57, A61K31/585, A61K31/365, A61K45/06, A61P3/04, A61P3/06, A61P3/08, A61P3/10 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/567 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/585 (EP,KR);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/567, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2022/04] | A61K31/365 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER INSULINEMPFINDLICHKEIT | [2022/04] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING INSULIN SENSITIVITY | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER LA SENSIBILITÉ À L'INSULINE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 14.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5073548 (COOK C EDGAR [US], et al) [YD] 10,11 * column 1, lines 14-67 *; | [IY]WO0152833 (CORTENDO AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-5,7-9 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 25 * * claims 1, 2, 29 * [Y] 10-12; | [IY]US2002147336 (DOW ROBERT L [US], et al) [I] 1-3,6-9,13,14 * page 10, paragraphs [0193], [0208] * * claims 62, 68 * [Y] 10-12; | [XY]WO03009853 (CORCEPT THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13,14 * page 3, lines 15-17 * * page 8, lines 15-18 * * page 9, lines 2-4 * * page 10, lines 22-31 * * page 12, line 19 - page 16, line 17 * * pages 26-27; examples 1-2 * * claims 1, 8, 9-14 * [Y] 10-12; | [IY]US2009088425 (BAILLY JACQUES [FR], et al) [I] 1-3,6-9,13-15 * page 1, paragraphs [0002], [0006], [0008]-[0009] * * page 16, paragraph [0377] * [Y] 10-12; | [XY] - DEBONO MIGUEL ET AL, "Mifepristone Reduces Insulin Resistance in Patient Volunteers with Adrenal Incidentalomas That Secrete Low Levels of Cortisol: A Pilot Study", PLOS ONE, vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0060984, (20130101), page e60984, URL: https://journals.plos.org/plosone/article/file?id=10.1371/journal.pone.0060984&type=printable, XP055981535 [X] 1-5,7-9,15 * abstract * * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 6; table 2 * * page 7, column 2, paragraph 3 * [Y] 10-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0060984 | [IY] - Anonymous, "History of Changes for Study: NCT03052400 Efficacy of Mifepristone in Males With Type 2 Diabetes Mellitus", ClinicalTrials.gov archive, (20170101), pages 1 - 7, URL: https://www.clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/history/NCT03052400?V_2=View#StudyPageTop, (20221115), XP055981665 [I] 1-5,7-9 * Study description, conditions; page 3 * * Arms and interventions; page 3 * [Y] 10-12 | [Y] - CHU J W ET AL, "Successful long-term treatment of refractory Cushing's disease with high-dose mifepristone (RU 486)", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, THE ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, US, (20010801), vol. 86, no. 8, doi:10.1210/JC.86.8.3568, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 3568 - 3573, XP002410091 [Y] 12 * abstract * * page 3572 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.86.8.3568 | [T] - GUBBI SRIRAM ET AL, "Mifepristone Improves Adipose Tissue Insulin Sensitivity in Insulin Resistant Individuals", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, US, vol. 106, no. 5, doi:10.1210/clinem/dgab046, ISSN 0021-972X, (20210423), pages 1501 - 1515, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC8063260/, XP055981608 [T] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1506; table 2 * * page 1508, column 2, paragraph l - page 1510, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/clinem/dgab046 | International search | [Y]US6166013 (COGHLAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 10 * ; col6 col7 col16 *; | [X]US2002147336 (DOW ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 16-18 * ; Abstract para[0208] *; | [A]US2004214804 (GULVE ERIC ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 7-24* ; entire document *; | [A]US2005080061 (BELANOFF JOSEPH K [US]) [A] 17-18, 24 * ; Abstract *; | [XY]US2009088425 (BAILLY JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1-5, 7, 11-15 * ; Abstract para[0007] para[0020] para[0059] para[0382] * [Y] 8-10, 19-23; | [X]CN102204918 (UNIV XIAMEN) [X] 24 * ; Abstract p3 *; | [Y]US2012028358 (SOLODUSHKO VICTOR [US], et al) [Y] 19-21 * ; para[0094] *; | [Y] - "miricorilantum", WHO Drug Information. Proposed INN: List 119, (20180000), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 283 - 398, XP055741138 [Y] 8-9 * ; p329 * | [Y] - CLORE et al., "When Is Cortisol a Mineralocorticoid?", Kidney International, (19921200), vol. 42, no. 6, doi:10.1038/ki.1992.421, pages 1297 - 1308, XP055741141 [Y] 22-23 * ; p1297, p1298 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ki.1992.421 |