EP3938132 - COMBINATION TOOL AS WELL AS DRILLS FOR SUCH A DRILLING/CHAMFERING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Marcus Heideloffstrasse 20 90478 Nurnberg / DE | 02 /
ECKL, Bernhard Tulpenweg 21 92546 Schmidgaden / DE | 03 /
KAUPER, Herbert Rudolf Burgweg 7 90574 Rosstal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
PAUL, Marcus 90478 Nurnberg / DE | ||
02 /
ECKL, Bernhard 92546 Schmidgaden / DE | |||
03 /
KAUPER, Herbert Rudolf 90574 Rosstal / DE | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20774494.7 | 13.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22647 | Priority number, date | DE201910203531 | 15.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019203531 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020190726 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938132 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/00, B23B51/10 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
B23B51/1085 (EP);
B23B51/108 (GB,US);
B23B51/0007 (EP,US);
B23B2251/04 (EP,GB);
B23B2251/043 (EP,GB,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | B23B51/08, B23B51/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSWERKZEUG SOWIE BOHRER FÜR EIN SOLCHES BOHR-/ANFASWERKZEUG | [2022/03] | English: | COMBINATION TOOL AS WELL AS DRILLS FOR SUCH A DRILLING/CHAMFERING TOOL | [2022/03] | French: | OUTIL DE COMBINAISON AINSI QUE FORETS POUR UN TEL OUTIL DE FORAGE/CHANFREINAGE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR954456 (GARCIA DE LA PARA, GEORGES-JACQUES-MARIE-GASTON [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XA]US4353670 (JORGENSEN CHARLES A) [X] 1-8,11 * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 11; figures 1-4 * [A] 9,10; | [A]EP0684099 (LINK JOHANN & ERNST GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, lines 8-34; figures 1, 2, 8, 9 * | International search | [A]US4353670 (JORGENSEN CHARLES A) [A] 1-11; | [A]US5211635 (OMI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11; | [A]WO2006060204 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]) [A] 1-11; | [A]US8142115 (REINHARDT WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-11; | [A]US8469642 (GARRICK RICHARD M [US], et al)[A] 1-11 | by applicant | US4353670 | DE102017210986 |