EP3943629 - ALUMINUM ALLOY AND ALUMINUM ALLOY DIE CASTING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Light Metal Co., Ltd. 1-1-13 Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | For all designated states Nikkei MC Aluminium Co., Ltd. 1-1-13, Shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-0004 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Izumi c/o Nikkei Research and Development Center, Nippon Light Metal Company, Ltd. 1-34-1, Kambara Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3203 / JP | 02 /
ISOBE, Tomohiro c/o Kambara Plant, Flux Department NIKKEI MC ALUMINIUM CO., LTD. 161, Kambara Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3297 / JP | 03 /
HORIKAWA, Hiroshi c/o NIKKEI MC ALUMINIUM CO., LTD. 1-1-13 Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | [2022/19] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
YAMAMOTO Izumi Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3203 / JP | ||
02 /
ISOBE Tomohiro Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3297 / JP | |||
03 /
HORIKAWA Hiroshi Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20774623.1 | 06.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020JP09593 | Priority number, date | JP20190052297 | 20.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019052297 | [2022/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020189325 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943629 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/02, C22C21/04, B22D21/04 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
C22C21/04 (EP);
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
B22D21/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | C22C21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG UND DRUCKGIESSMATERIAL AUS ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG | [2022/04] | English: | ALUMINUM ALLOY AND ALUMINUM ALLOY DIE CASTING MATERIAL | [2022/04] | French: | ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM ET MATÉRIAU DE COULÉE SOUS PRESSION EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2021 | Translation filed | 06.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 18.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001008155 (HASHIMOTO AKIO [JP], et al); | [IA]EP3121302 (DAIKI ALUMINIUM IND CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS5413407 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-6; | [A]JP2004143511 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al)[A] 1-4; | [A]JP2015157588 (NSK LTD) [A] 1-6; | [A]WO2016166779 (DAIKI ALUMINIUM IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 | by applicant | JPH0146785B |