EP3941001 - SERVER SYSTEM AND REDUNDANCY METHOD FOR PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icom Incorporated 1-6-19, Kamikurazukuri, Hirano-ku Osaka 547-0004 / JP | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANO, Akira c/o ICOM INCORPORATED 1-6-19, Kamikurazukuri Hirano-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 547-0004 / JP | 02 /
MIYAKOSHI, Yoshiaki c/o ICOM INCORPORATED 1-6-19, Kamikurazukuri Hirano-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 547-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
NAKANO, Akira Osaka-shi, Osaka 547-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAKOSHI, Yoshiaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 547-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20774807.0 | 23.01.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020JP02323 | Priority number, date | JP20190048649 | 15.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019048649 | [2022/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020189002 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941001 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/07, G06F11/20, G06F11/14 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
G06F11/1482 (EP);
H04L65/1046 (US);
G06F11/2035 (EP);
G06F11/2048 (EP);
H04L67/10 (US);
G06F11/1438 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | H04L12/703, G06F11/07, G06F11/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | SERVERSYSTEM UND REDUNDANZVERFAHREN FÜR PROZESSE | [2022/03] | English: | SERVER SYSTEM AND REDUNDANCY METHOD FOR PROCESSES | [2022/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SERVEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE REDONDANCE POUR PROCESSUS | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2021 | Translation filed | 13.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5852724 (GLENN II FLETCHER M [US], et al); | [Y]US5974114 (BLUM ANDREA G [US], et al); | [XYI]US5978933 (WYLD BRIAN CHRISTOPHER [FR], et al); | [A]JP2013161266 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | International search | [Y]JP2006172050 (YASKAWA INFORMATION SYSTEMS CO, et al); | [Y]JP2017027110 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JP2013077983 | WO2017086416 |